This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2018 at 07:02:47 (UTC).

Spiegel v. George et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2018 Spiegel filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against George. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lynn Adelman and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01169

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lynn Adelman

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Appellant

Marshall Spiegel

Appellees

David Novoselsky

Waukegan, IL 60085

Charmain J Novoselsky

United States of America

Virginia George

Jennifer Novoselsky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

John S Xydakis

Attorney at Law Office of John S Xydakis

30 N Michigan Ave - Ste 402

Chicago, IL 60602

Appellee Attorneys

David A Novoselsky

Attorney at Novoselsky Law Offices

25 N County St - 1St Fl

Waukegan, IL 60085

Timothy H Posnanski

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

555 E Wells St - Ste 1900

Milwaukee, WI 53202-3819

Claire Ann Resop

Attorney at Steinhilber Swanson LLP

8040 Excelsior Dr - Ste 301

Madison, WI 53717

Daryl L Diesing

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

555 E Wells St - Ste 1900

Milwaukee, WI 53202-3819

Jonathan V Goodman

Attorney at Law Offices of Jonathan V Goodman

788 N Jefferson St - Ste 707

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Curtis J Weidler

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (DC)

555 4Th St Nw, Po Box 7238

Washington, DC 20044-7238

Michael F Dubis

Attorney at Michael F Dubis SC

208 E Main St

Waterford, WI 53185

Forrest B Lammiman

Attorney at Meltzer Purtill & Stelle LLC

300 S Wacker Dr - Ste 2300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER Electronically Transmitted to Parties (asc)

2 #6

Documents 405-425

2 #5

Document 404

2 #8

Document 427

2 #7

Document 426

2 #2

Documents 1-110

2 #1

Bankruptcy Docket Sheet

2 #4

Document 403

2 #3

Documents 111-402

2 #10

Documents 428-481

2 #9

Document 427-continued

#2

(#2) RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 14-29136. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 Documents 1-110, #3 Documents 111-402, #4 Document 403, #5 Document 404, #6 Documents 405-425, #7 Document 426, #8 Document 427, #9 Document 427-continued, #10 Documents 428-481, #11 Document 482, #12 Documents 483-630, #13 Documents 631-761, #14 Documents 762-911, #15 Documents 912-1047, #16 Documents 1048-1195, #17 Documents 1196-1357, #18 Documents 1358-1452, #19 Documents 1453-1668, #20 Documents 1669-1711, #21 Documents 1712-1784)(wieb)

2 #15

Documents 912-1047

2 #16

Documents 1048-1195

2 #17

Documents 1196-1357

2 #18

Documents 1358-1452

2 #11

Document 482

2 #12

Documents 483-630

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING LETTER Electronically Transmitted to Parties (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 14-29136. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #2 Documents 1-110, #3 Documents 111-402, #4 Document 403, #5 Document 404, #6 Documents 405-425, #7 Document 426, #8 Document 427, #9 Document 427-continued, #10 Documents 428-481, #11 Document 482, #12 Documents 483-630, #13 Documents 631-761, #14 Documents 762-911, #15 Documents 912-1047, #16 Documents 1048-1195, #17 Documents 1196-1357, #18 Documents 1358-1452, #19 Documents 1453-1668, #20 Documents 1669-1711, #21 Documents 1712-1784)(wieb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ASSIGNED IN ERROR NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman (jcl) Modified on 7/31/2018 (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 14-29136; (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(wieb)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.