This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 07:51:11 (UTC).

Spicer v. Bradley

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 Spicer filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bradley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael John Aloi and Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00194

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

Presiding Judge

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Deonte Spicer

Waymart, PA 18472

Respondent

Warden Bradley

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/18. (mh) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) LETTER from Deonte Spicer to Clerk of Court requesting status of filing fee. (Public docket sheet mailed to Petitioner) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. It is ORDERED that this matter be transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of PA and that this case be terminated from the Court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/29/18. (mh) (copy via cert. mail to Petitioner) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING, #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #3

Certified Mail Return Receipt

3 #2

PTAR

3 #1

IFP Application

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 PTAR)(mh) (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

2 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

1 #11

Envelope

1 #10

Cover letter

1 #9

Exhibit 8 - Counsel correspondence

1 #8

Exhibit 7 - Warrant for return of prisoner released to supervision

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Transcript excerpt

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/18. (mh) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER from Deonte Spicer to Clerk of Court requesting status of filing fee. (Public docket sheet mailed to Petitioner) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Case Transfer Complete - Case transferred to Middle District of Pennsylvania. on 10/29/2018. Middle District of Pennsylvania case number is 3:18cv02088. (jmm) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Case transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (mh) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. It is ORDERED that this matter be transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of PA and that this case be terminated from the Court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/29/18. (mh) (copy via cert. mail to Petitioner) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING, #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/22/2018. (jmm) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002385 (mh) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 PTAR)(mh) (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241 against Bradley, filed by Deonte Spicer. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Designation, #2 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 3 - Transcript excerpt, #5 Exhibit 4 - USDOJ Document - Parole Commission, #6 Exhibit 5 - WVND J&C, #7 Exhibit 6 - USDOJ Document - Parole Commission, #8 Exhibit 7 - Warrant for return of prisoner released to supervision, #9 Exhibit 8 - Counsel correspondence, #10 Cover letter, #11 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.