This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:42:40 (UTC).

Sperber v. Van De Stroet

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Sperber filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Van De Stroet. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04115

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Sperber

Defendant

Jesse Van De Stroet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek A. Nelsen

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Eric T. Preheim

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant Attorneys

Jason R. Sutton

Attorney at Boyce Law Firm, LLP

300 South Main Avenue, Po Box 5015

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

John P. Mullen

Attorney at Boyce Law Firm, LLP

300 South Main Avenue, Po Box 5015

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/22/2019. Motions due by 6/19/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/9/18. (JLS) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#9

(#9) Discovery Report re #8 Order for Discovery Report by Gary Sperber. Related document: #8 Order for Discovery Report.(Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/18/18. (DJP) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jesse Van De Stroet. (Sutton, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Sutton on behalf of Jesse Van De Stroet. (Sutton, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Mullen on behalf of Jesse Van De Stroet. (Mullen, John) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Gary Sperber. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

3 #2

AO85 Form

3 #1

Summons Issued - Van De Stroet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Jesse Van De Stroet. 1 original summons, A085 form, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Van De Stroet, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Membership and Stock Purchase Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gary Sperber in shell case on 9/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Membership and Stock Purchase Agreement) (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/22/2019. Motions due by 6/19/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/9/18. (JLS) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Discovery Report re #8 Order for Discovery Report by Gary Sperber. Related document: #8 Order for Discovery Report.(Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/18/18. (DJP) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jesse Van De Stroet. (Sutton, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Sutton on behalf of Jesse Van De Stroet. (Sutton, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Mullen on behalf of Jesse Van De Stroet. (Mullen, John) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Gary Sperber. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Jesse Van De Stroet. 1 original summons, A085 form, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Van De Stroet, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Filing Fee Received from Gary Sperber. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2876384. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gary Sperber in shell case on 9/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Membership and Stock Purchase Agreement) (JLS) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.