This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:36:29 (UTC).

Spangler v. East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Spangler filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00556

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Minnie Spangler

Defendant

East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Escum L. Moore, III

Attorney at Moore & Moore, PLLC

141 Prosperous Place, Suite 22B

Lexington, KY 40509

Benjamin C. Tuttle

Attorney at Moore & Moore, PLLC

141 Prosperous Place, Suite 22B

Lexington, KY 40509

Defendant Attorneys

David T. Royse

Attorney at Ransdell, Roach and Royse, PLLC

176 Pasadena Drive, Building 1

Lexington, KY 40503

W. Keith Ransdell

Attorney at Ransdell, Roach and Royse, PLLC

176 Pasadena Drive, Building 1

Lexington, KY 40503

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY BRIEF to #8 , #9 filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. (Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. filed by Minnie Spangler. (Moore, Escum) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., filed by Minnie Spangler.(Tuttle, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

(#4) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. (Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. (Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #3

State Court Record Plaintiff's Response

1 #2

State Court Record Motion to Dismiss

1 #1

State Court Record Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00343. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4182043), filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Record Motion to Dismiss, #3 State Court Record Plaintiff's Response)(JLM) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. (GLD) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY BRIEF to #8 , #9 filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. (Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. filed by Minnie Spangler. (Moore, Escum) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (#7) VIRTUAL ORDER: Denying without prejudice MOTION to Dismiss (filed in state court record) by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/12/2018.(GLD)cc: COR (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., filed by Minnie Spangler.(Tuttle, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) VIRTUAL ORDER: GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART dft's #4 Proposed Agreed Order; The plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before October 12, 2018. However, the question of whether the allegations relate back to the date of the original filing is a legal question that is not subject to stipulation of the parties. Further, once an Amended Complaint is filed, the pending motion to dismiss will be denied, without prejudice to a separate motion being filed in response to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/10/18. (KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. (Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.. (Ransdell, W.) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLM) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION to Dismiss by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. filed by Minnie Spangler. Filed in State Court Record, see #1 . (JLM) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to Dismiss by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. filed in state court record. See #1 . (JLM) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00343. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4182043), filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Record Motion to Dismiss, #3 State Court Record Plaintiff's Response)(JLM) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.