This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2019 at 07:41:02 (UTC).

Southern Visions, LLP v. Red Diamond, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Southern Visions, LLP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Red Diamond, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John H England, III and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02039

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John H England, III

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Southern Visions, LLP

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Red Diamond Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dan R Gresham

Attorney at THOMAS KAYDEN HORSTEMEYER & RISLEY LLP

600 Galleria Parkway Nw, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30339

Wesley Austin Roberts

Attorney at THOMAS HORSTEMEYER

Suite 1600E, 3200 Windy Hill Road, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

N Andrew Crain

Attorney at THOMAS KAYDEN HORSTEMEYER & RISLEY LLP

600 Galleria Parkway Nw, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30339

Matthew H Lembke

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North, 521-8000, Fax: 488-6560

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joel M Kuehnert

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

James MacDonald Robertson

Attorney at JM ROBERTSON LLC

2140 11Th Avenue So., Ste 212

Birmingham, AL 35205

Elizabeth Jones Flachsbart

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

1901 6Th Avenue North, Ste. 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael Paul Taunton

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM, LLP

P.O. Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35203

Clinton Ray South

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT, FRANKLIN AND WHITE, LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Marcus R Chatterton

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2700, P O Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35201-0306

Alan T Rogers

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

1901 6Th Avenue North, Ste. 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

T. Joshua Archer

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP-Atl

Suite 700, 30 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd., N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3036

Harlan Irby Prater, IV

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#93

(#93) Evidentiary Material re: 90 Order, (NOTICE OF CONVENTIONALLY-FILED EVIDENTIARY MATERIALS FOR IN-CAMERA REVIEW: DOCUMENTS TO SUPPORT DECLARATION OF MATTHEW H. LEMBKE). (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

92 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Matthew H. Lembke

#92

(#92) RESPONSE to re 90 Court's Order dated 2/6/2019 filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew H. Lembke)(Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#91

(#91) REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION to Strike #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#84

(#84) MOTION to Strike #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys by Southern Visions, LLP. (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

76 #5

Affidavit Douglas McElvy

76 #4

Affidavit Harlan Prater

76 #3

Affidavit Clinton South

#76

(#84) MOTION to Strike #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys by Southern Visions, LLP. (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J- Claim Chart for the '852 Patent

1 #9

Exhibit I- '852 Patent

1 #8

Exhibit H- Claim Chart for the '232 Patent

1 #7

Exhibit G- '232 Patent

1 #6

Exhibit F- Claim Chart for the '634 Patent

1 #5

Exhibit E- '634 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C- '330 Patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8178455) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- '222 Patent, #2 Exhibit B- Claim Chart for the '222 Patent, #3 Exhibit C- '330 Patent, #4 Exhibit D- Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #5 Exhibit E- '634 Patent, #6 Exhibit F- Claim Chart for the '634 Patent, #7 Exhibit G- '232 Patent, #8 Exhibit H- Claim Chart for the '232 Patent, #9 Exhibit I- '852 Patent, #10 Exhibit J- Claim Chart for the '852 Patent, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

179 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Evidentiary Material re: 90 Order, (NOTICE OF CONVENTIONALLY-FILED EVIDENTIARY MATERIALS FOR IN-CAMERA REVIEW: DOCUMENTS TO SUPPORT DECLARATION OF MATTHEW H. LEMBKE). (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) RESPONSE to re 90 Court's Order dated 2/6/2019 filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew H. Lembke)(Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION to Strike #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#90) TEXT ORDER On or before Friday, February 8, 2019 at 3:00 pm CT, counsel for Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an affidavit and supporting documentation stating exactly when Bradley Arant Boult Cummings began representing Southern Visions, LLP in this matter. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/6/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#89) TEXT ORDER The hearing on Defendant's motion to disqualify previously set for February 11, 2019 at 2:00 pm CT is RESCHEDULED to February 11, 2019 at 5:00 pm CT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/6/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Strike #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys RED DIAMOND, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF J. DOUGLAS MCELVY filed by Red Diamond Inc. (Rogers, Alan) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys filed by Red Diamond Inc. (South, Clinton) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) Evidentiary Material re: #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys (Notice of In Camera Submission). (South, Clinton) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John D. Watson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Matthew H. Lembke, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Bruce P. Ely, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Ethan Tidmore, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of B. David Joffe, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Lori D. Martin, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Stewart M. Cox)(Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) MOTION to Strike #76 MOTION To Disqualify Bradley Arant Attorneys by Southern Visions, LLP. (Lembke, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Southern Visions, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed by Southern Visions, LLP. Red Diamond, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AO Form 120 forwarded to Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Southern Visions, LLP. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern Visions, LLP. (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED AO 120 . (Crain, Norman) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Diamond, Inc. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Southern Visions, LLP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8178455) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- '222 Patent, #2 Exhibit B- Claim Chart for the '222 Patent, #3 Exhibit C- '330 Patent, #4 Exhibit D- Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #5 Exhibit E- '634 Patent, #6 Exhibit F- Claim Chart for the '634 Patent, #7 Exhibit G- '232 Patent, #8 Exhibit H- Claim Chart for the '232 Patent, #9 Exhibit I- '852 Patent, #10 Exhibit J- Claim Chart for the '852 Patent, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 12/11/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Red Diamond Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan Robert Gresham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Howard Lembke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman Andrew Crain