This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 20:06:36 (UTC).

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., v. SEIU UHW-West

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 Southern California Healthcare System, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SEIU UHW-West. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-05301

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Counter Defendants

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., doing business as Southern California Hospital at Culver City

Respondent

SEIU UHW-WEST

Counter Claimant

Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Counter Defendant Attorney

Matthew D Pearson

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Adam J Thomas

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld APC

800 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1320

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2607

Bruce A Harland

Attorney at Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

1001 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 200

Alameda, CA 94501

Monica Teresa Guizar

Attorney at Weinberg Roger and Rosenfeld APC

800 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1320

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2607

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTICE JOINT NOTICE OF REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO REOPEN THE ACTION filed by Joint (Petitioner & Respondent) SEIU UHW-West, Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#28

(#28) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Manuel L. Real. THE COURT having been advised by the counsel for the parties that the above entitled action has been settled #27 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set in this action are hereby vacated. The Court reserves its jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the settlement. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Petitioner/Cross-Respondent Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

20 #7

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order For Judgment of Motion for Summary Judgment

20 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

20 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

20 #1

Declaration Declaration of Adam Thomas in Support of SEIU-UHW'S Motion for

#20

(#21) STATEMENT SEIU-UHW'S Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law and Proposed Judgment filed by Respondent SEIU UHW-West, Counter Claimant Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West re: Notice (Other) #19 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 . (Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

#19

(#21) STATEMENT SEIU-UHW'S Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law and Proposed Judgment filed by Respondent SEIU UHW-West, Counter Claimant Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West re: Notice (Other) #19 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 . (Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,, upon Respondent SEIU UHW-West acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2017, answer due 8/10/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Adam Thomas, Attorney for Respondent. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

#8

(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV17-04247 R (PJWx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV17-5301 R (PJWx). Signed by Judge Manuel L. Real. (dv) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Petition #1 as to respondent SEIU UHW-West. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,, identifying Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Petition #1 as to respondent SEIU UHW-West. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • Docket(#30) TEXT ONLY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO REOPEN THE ACTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Request to Extend Time to Reopen the Action filed January 12, 2018 (Dckt. No. 29). The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Request and hereby ORDERS that the time to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated shall now be JANUARY 22, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE JOINT NOTICE OF REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO REOPEN THE ACTION filed by Joint (Petitioner & Respondent) SEIU UHW-West, Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Manuel L. Real. THE COURT having been advised by the counsel for the parties that the above entitled action has been settled #27 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set in this action are hereby vacated. The Court reserves its jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the settlement. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Petitioner/Cross-Respondent Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Respondent/Cross-Petitioner SEIU-UHW's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dckt. No. #19 #20 ) set for hearing on December 18, 2017 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of December 18, 2017 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATEMENT of Disputed Facts and Additional Undisputed Facts NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 Respondent/Cross-Petitioner SEIU-UHW'S Reply to Petitioner/Cross-Respondent SCHCC'S Statement of Disputed Facts and Additional Undisputed Facts filed by Respondent SEIU UHW-West, Counter Claimant Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West. (Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 Respondent/Cross-Petitioner SEIU-UHW'S Reply to Petitioner/Cross-Respondent SCHCC'S Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Respondent SEIU UHW-West, Counter Claimant Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Adam Thomas in Support of Respondent/Cross-Petitioner SEIU-UHW'S Response to Petitioner/Cross-Respondent SCHCC'S Opposition to Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATEMENT of Disputed Facts and ADditional Undisputed Facts NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 in support of Opposition to Respondent SEIU UHW-West's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Opposition to Respondent SEIU UHW-West's Motion for Summary Judgment Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATEMENT SEIU-UHW'S Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law and Proposed Judgment filed by Respondent SEIU UHW-West, Counter Claimant Service Employees International Union United Healthcare Workers - West re: Notice (Other) #19 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought on by Employer #20 . (Thomas, Adam) (Entered: 11/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Court Order on July 24, 2017 reassigning case to District Judge Manuel L. Real filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,, upon Respondent SEIU UHW-West acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2017, answer due 8/10/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Adam Thomas, Attorney for Respondent. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV17-04247 R (PJWx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV17-5301 R (PJWx). Signed by Judge Manuel L. Real. (dv) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Petition #1 as to respondent SEIU UHW-West. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,, identifying Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Vacate Arbitration Award Brought by Employer Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 185 Receipt No: 0973-20202264 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,. (Attorney Matthew D Pearson added to party Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.,(pty:pet))(Pearson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica Teresa Guizar