This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2018 at 12:32:03 (UTC).

SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC et al v. GILL et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2015 SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against GILL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ORDER OF THE IAL INC

EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC

DAN VAN GASKEN

SOUTH EAST ENTERPRISE GROUP LLC

KAREN GILL

KEVIN HARTSHORN

MULTI MARTS CORP

Defendants, Counter Claimants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs

MICHAEL GILL

MULTI MARTS CORP

PMCA LLC

LOREN C GILL

JOHN DOES

JOHN GILL

STEVE THOMAS

Plaintiffs, Intervenor Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

DAN VAN GASKEN

KEVIN HARTSHORN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

BRIDGET A ZERNER(Designation Retained)

JOHN J E MARKHAM, II

RICHARD ALLEN CHILDS(Designation Retained)

JOHN J E MARKHAM, II(Designation Retained)

Defendant, Counter Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

CRAIG KUNKES

RICHARD L ROBBINS(Designation Retained)

JASON S ALLOY

JAMES MATTHEW BRIGMAN

RICHARD L ROBBINS

 

Court Documents

#101

(#101) ORDER denying 86 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/22/2016. (CCL)

#77

(#77) ORDER denying 65 Motion to Quash. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/28/2015. (CGC)

#53

(#53) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/29/2015. (CGC)

#49

(#49) ORDER denying 33 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 04/21/2015. (CGC)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) ORDER denying 86 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/22/2016. (CCL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ORDER denying 65 Motion to Quash. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/28/2015. (CGC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/29/2015. (CGC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ORDER denying 33 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 04/21/2015. (CGC)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget A. Zerner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J.E. Markham II