This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:26:11 (UTC).

Sony Music Entertainment et al v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Sony Music Entertainment filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cox Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00950

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.

Universal Music Publishing Inc.

Universal Music Corp.

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

EMI Miller Catalog Inc.

EMI Unart Catalog Inc.

Arista Music

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

EMI Algee Music Corp.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Colgems-EMI Music Inc.

Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited

Nonesuch Records Inc.

Volcano Entertainment III, LLC

Universal Music Publishing AB

EMI Feist Catalog Inc.

Roadrunner Records, Inc.

Universal Music Publishing Limited

Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited

Music Corporation of America, Inc.

100 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Scott Alexander Zebrak

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

5225 Wisconsin Ave Nw, Suite 503

Washington, DC 20015

Other Attorneys

Thomas M. Buchanan

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1700 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

#19

#18

#17

#5

4 #1

Notice

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Diana Hughes Leiden and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas M. Buchanan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6289861. by Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC. (Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/25/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/25/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/25/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404,. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Hearing Date set for October 26, 2018 re #22 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, (Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE by Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC re #22 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, of Request for Judicial Notice in Support (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1)(Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, filed by Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda J. Trickey in Support)(Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, by Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Univeral - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC by Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC.(Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Elkin, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence, #3 Proposed Order)(Buchanan, Thomas) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/7/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/7/18. (klau, ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Gould and Certification of Local Counsel Scott A. Zebrak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6209882. Filed by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Univeral - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Oppenheim and Certification of Local Counsel Scott A. Zebrak Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6209837. Filed by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Univeral - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC. (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketReport on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright filed. Copy sent to Copyright Office Library of Congress. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Univeral - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Report on the Filing of an action regarding a copyright (Zebrak, Scott) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Arista Music, Arista Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Algee Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Laface Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Univeral - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Universal/Island Music Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cox Communications, Inc., CoxCom, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6204868.), filed by Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., EMI Algee Music Corp., WB Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Laface Records LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Rondor Music International, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Unichappell Music Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Univeral/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Univeral - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Rightsong Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, EMI April Music Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Universal - Polygram International Tunes, Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Arista Music, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, EMI Unart Catalog Inc., Zomba Recordings LLC, Stone Agate Music, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., Universal/Island Music Limited, EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI U Catalog Inc., Arista Records, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nonesuch Records Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Miller Catalog Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VOLCANO ENTERTAINMENT III, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Algee Music Corp. is a litigant