This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2018 at 02:26:26 (UTC).

Solomon v. Campbell et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 Solomon filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Campbell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan O. Hickey and Barry A. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04001

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

Referral Judge

Barry A. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifton Orlando Solomon

Texarkana, AR 71854

Defendants

Captain Adams

Warden Walker

Corporal Henderson

Officer Campbell

Sergeant Sanders

Sheriff Jackie Reunion

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Clifton Orlando Solomon. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Captain Adams, Officer Campbell, Corporal Henderson, Jackie Reunion, Sergeant Sanders, Warden Walker filed by Clifton Orlando Solomon. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Certification page to IFP Application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/25/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 4, 2018. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF MAILING re courtesy copies was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant Clifton Orlando Solomon on 1/4/2018. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF MAILING: The 1983 Prisoner Litigation Guide was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant Clifton Orlando Solomon on 1/4/2018. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Certification page to IFP Application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/25/2018. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 4, 2018. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Clifton Orlando Solomon. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Captain Adams, Officer Campbell, Corporal Henderson, Jackie Reunion, Sergeant Sanders, Warden Walker filed by Clifton Orlando Solomon. (mll) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.