This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2018 at 07:03:20 (UTC).

S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia v. Wowwee Usa, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 S N Enterprises, Inc Of Virginia filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Wowwee Usa, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel, Andrew G. Schopler and Michael S. Berg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02255

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judges

Andrew G. Schopler

Michael S. Berg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia

Defendants

Wowwee Usa, Inc.

Wowwee Canada, Inc.

Wowwee Group Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neil D Greenstein

Attorney at TechMark

1968 S. Coast Highway, Suite 1636

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J. Farnese

Attorney at Milstein Adelman & Kreger LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop N

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Ashly Erin Sands

Attorney at Epstein Drangel LLP

60 E. 42Nd Street, Suite 2520

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #4

Exhibit B

14 #3

Exhibit A

14 #2

Declaration

14 #1

Declaration

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #16

Exhibit 11 to Greenstein Declaration

8 #7

Exhibit E

8 #6

Exhibit D

8 #5

Exhibit C

8 #4

Exhibit B

8 #3

Exhibit A

8 #2

Declaration of Ashly E. Sands

8 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#8

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) OBJECTION to Reply Declarations by S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia re #14 Reply to Response to Motion. (Greenstein, Neil). Modified on 11/23/2018 - Edited text (jah). (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wowwee Canada, Inc., Wowwee Group Limited, Wowwee Usa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sands, Ashly) (dlg). (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashly Erin Sands, re #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/8/2018. (mdc) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2255-GPC-MSB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/7/18.(dlg) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11877457.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sands, Ashly) (mdc) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elliot J. Stein, #2 Declaration Tasha L. McDonald, #3 Exhibit 1 to McDonald Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to McDonald Declaration, #5 Declaration of Neil D. Greenstein, #6 Exhibit 1 to Greenstein Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to Greenstein Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3 to Greenstein Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4 to Greenstein Declaration, #10 Exhibit 5 to Greenstein Declaration, #11 Exhibit 6 to Greenstein Declaration, #12 Exhibit 7 to Greenstein Declaration, #13 Exhibit 8 to Greenstein Declaration, #14 Exhibit 9 to Greenstein Declaration, #15 Exhibit 10 to Greenstein Declaration, #16 Exhibit 11 to Greenstein Declaration, #17 Exhibit 12 to Greenstein Declaration, #18 Exhibit 13 to Greenstein Declaration, #19 Exhibit 14 to Greenstein Declaration, #20 Exhibit 15 to Greenstein Declaration, #21 Exhibit 16 to Greenstein Declaration, #22 Exhibit 17 to Greenstein Declaraiton, #23 Exhibit 18 to Greenstein Declaration, #24 Exhibit 19 to Greenstein Declaration, #25 Exhibit 20 to Greenstein Declaration, #26 Notice of Plaintiff's Objections to Ashly Sands Declaration)(Greenstein, Neil) (dlg). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #8 MOTION to Dismiss : Any opposition shall be filed on or before November 9, 2018. Any reply shall be filed on or before November 16, 2018. A hearing is set on December 7, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/29/18.(dlg) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Wowwee Canada, Inc., Wowwee Usa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ashly E. Sands, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Farnese, Peter) (dlg). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Wowwee Usa, Inc., Wowwee Canada, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wowwee Canada, Inc., Wowwee Usa, Inc. . (Farnese, Peter) (dlg). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 7 *** MOTION to Dismiss by Wowwee Canada, Inc., Wowwee Usa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Farnese, Peter)Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party Wowwee Canada, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party Wowwee Usa, Inc.(pty:dft) QC email, missing hearing date and time (dlg). Modified on 10/29/2018 (dlg). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK's CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Wowwee Group Limited Pursuant to FRCP 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) and 4(h)(2) by S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk's Office)(dlg) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (no document attached) (mme) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *3,289,747*, *4,505,483*, *5,325,724* cc:USPTO (mme) (jao). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wowwee Canada, Inc., Wowwee Group Limited, Wowwee Usa, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11729531.), filed by S&N Enterprises, Inc. Of Virginia.The new case number is 3:18-cv-02255-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Greenstein, Neil)(mme) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2018: #1 Copyright Report) (mme). [Copyright Report Mailed] (mme). (jao). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&N Enterprises, Inc. of Virginia d/b/a S&N Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil D Greenstein