This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 08:10:29 (UTC).

Smith v. Winstar World Casino

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Winstar World Casino. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00331

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaynise Lanee Smith

Arlington, TX 76015

Defendant

Winstar World Casino

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#12

(#12) LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#7

(#7) OBJECTION/Appeal Form re: #6 Order filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (sss) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/4/2018) (epm) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Winstar World Casino filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder directing plaintiff supplement the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) no later than 10/31/2018. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#9

(#9) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern (Entered: 10/05/2018)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORDER: The subject matter of this action, as reflected in the complaint, concerns events that occurred at Winstar World Casino, which the Court notes is located in Thackerville, Oklahoma, in Love County, Oklahoma, within the Eastern District of Oklahoma. See 28 U.S.C. 116(b). This action will be transferred under the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6 to the Eastern District of Oklahoma on October 2, 2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Scholer within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. See FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/11/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder directing plaintiff supplement the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) no later than 10/31/2018. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Oct 4 14:23:15 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/4/2018) (epm) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OBJECTION/Appeal Form re: #6 Order filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (sss) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 11 14:23:29 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: The subject matter of this action, as reflected in the complaint, concerns events that occurred at Winstar World Casino, which the Court notes is located in Thackerville, Oklahoma, in Love County, Oklahoma, within the Eastern District of Oklahoma. See 28 U.S.C. 116(b). This action will be transferred under the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6 to the Eastern District of Oklahoma on October 2, 2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Scholer within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. See FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/11/2018) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Sep 10 15:10:53 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Winstar World Casino filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.