This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 08:06:42 (UTC).

Smith v. U.S. Trustee et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Smith filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against U S Trustee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01181

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

Maurice Kevin Smith

Falls Church, VA 22041

Defendant

USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)

Appellee

U.S. Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Jack Ira Frankel

Attorney at Office of United States Trustee

115 South Union Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Robert Breen Van Arsdale

Attorney at Office of the U. S. Trustee

701 East Broad Street, Suite 4304

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File; and that the time for the United States Trustee to file his brief in this appeal is extended to December 9, 2018, or, if Appellant is granted an extension for his brief, thirty days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/05/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#11

(#11) Miscellaneous filing by Maurice Kevin Smith. Filing given to Bankruptcy Court on 10/03/2018 and then to USDC on 11/01/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Brief by U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Arsdale, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 11/8/2018. Appellee Brief due by 11/22/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/6/2018. (c/s to pro se Appellant)(jlan) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

7 #1

Designation of Record of Appeal

#7

(#7) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record of Appeal)(jlan) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDERED that the Court hereby RESCINDS its 9/24/2018 order #4 and GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/2/2018. (rban, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Brian F. Kenney on 09/17/2018 (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER - The Court has received Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . The Court is unable to evaluate Plaintiffs motion without a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk is instructed to provide Plaintiff with this Order and the attached form for Plaintiff to complete and return to the Court. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/24/2018. (c/s as directed in Order)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 09-17237-BFK. File received, filed by Maurice Kevin Smith.(dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File; and that the time for the United States Trustee to file his brief in this appeal is extended to December 9, 2018, or, if Appellant is granted an extension for his brief, thirty days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/05/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Miscellaneous filing by Maurice Kevin Smith. Filing given to Bankruptcy Court on 10/03/2018 and then to USDC on 11/01/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Brief by U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Arsdale, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Transcript of Bankruptcy Hearing dated 08/28/2018. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Bankruptcy Scheduling Order: Appellant Brief due by 11/8/2018. Appellee Brief due by 11/22/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/6/2018. (c/s to pro se Appellant)(jlan) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record of Appeal)(jlan) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDERED that the Court hereby RESCINDS its 9/24/2018 order #4 and GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/2/2018. (rban, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Brian F. Kenney on 09/17/2018 (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER - The Court has received Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 . The Court is unable to evaluate Plaintiffs motion without a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk is instructed to provide Plaintiff with this Order and the attached form for Plaintiff to complete and return to the Court. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/24/2018. (c/s as directed in Order)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maurice Kevin Smith. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 09-17237-BFK. File received, filed by Maurice Kevin Smith.(dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.