This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:40:20 (UTC).

Smith v. Stuckey et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Stuckey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01017

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harold Smith

Defendants

Marsh U S A Inc

A B C Insurance Companies

Covenant Transport Inc

Eric R Stuckey

Marsh U S A Inc doing business as Marsh U S A Risk Services

Covenant Transportation Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John H Stevens

Attorney at Grenfell & Stevens

P O Box 16570

Jackson, MS 39236-6570

Defendant Attorneys

James A Prather

Attorney at Galloway Johnson et al (MAND)

3 Sanctuary Blvd Ste 301

Mandeville, LA 70471

Campbell Bowman Fetzer, Jr

Attorney at Galloway Johnson et al (MAND)

3 Sanctuary Blvd Ste 301

Mandeville, LA 70471

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of counsel, the scheduling conference set for November 6, 2018 will now be conducted by telephone. The court will initiate the conference call, and dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. The use of cell phones is prohibited. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/26/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/16/2018. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/30/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/21/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

13 #1

Exhibit A-B

#13

(#13) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covenant Transport Inc re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(aty,Fetzer, Campbell) Modified docket text on 8/29/2018 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covenant Transport Inc identifying Corporate Parent Covenant Transportation Group Inc for Covenant Transport Inc. (aty,Fetzer, Campbell) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Covenant Transport Inc. Covenant will be allowed until September 10, 2018 to file an amended notice of removal in response to the issues noted in this Memorandum Order. Compliance Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/20/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Covenant Transport Inc.(aty,Prather, James) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER that within 20 days any attorney appearing as counsel of record in this action who is not presently admitted to practice before this Court exercise on of the following options: File an application to practice in this Court; File a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice pursuant to L.R. 83.2.6; or, Secure substitute counsel admitted to practice in this court for the party presently being represented. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/15/2018. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Campbell Bowman Fetzer, Jr, James A Prather on behalf of Covenant Transport Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/22/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00687. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support of #3 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District filed by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fetzer, Campbell) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Fetzer, Campbell) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 26th JDC Webster Parish, Case Number 77145. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1793904), filed by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Fetzer, Campbell) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of counsel, the scheduling conference set for November 6, 2018 will now be conducted by telephone. The court will initiate the conference call, and dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. The use of cell phones is prohibited. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/26/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/16/2018. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/30/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/21/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covenant Transport Inc re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(aty,Fetzer, Campbell) Modified docket text on 8/29/2018 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covenant Transport Inc identifying Corporate Parent Covenant Transportation Group Inc for Covenant Transport Inc. (aty,Fetzer, Campbell) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Covenant Transport Inc. Covenant will be allowed until September 10, 2018 to file an amended notice of removal in response to the issues noted in this Memorandum Order. Compliance Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/20/2018. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Covenant Transport Inc.(aty,Prather, James) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that within 20 days any attorney appearing as counsel of record in this action who is not presently admitted to practice before this Court exercise on of the following options: File an application to practice in this Court; File a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice pursuant to L.R. 83.2.6; or, Secure substitute counsel admitted to practice in this court for the party presently being represented. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/15/2018. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED TRANSFER ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Campbell Bowman Fetzer, Jr, James A Prather on behalf of Covenant Transport Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/22/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00687. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 08/08/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM in Support of #3 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District filed by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fetzer, Campbell) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Fetzer, Campbell) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Attorney John H. Stevens who is lead counsel for party Harold Smith. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 26th JDC Webster Parish, Case Number 77145. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1793904), filed by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Fetzer, Campbell) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/8/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less