Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2019 at 07:58:13 (UTC).

Smith v. San Francisco District Attorney's Office et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Smith filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against San Francisco District Attorney's Office. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero, Edward M. Chen and PSLC CET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-06747

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

PSLC CET

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lewis Francis Smith, Jr.II

San Bruno, CA 94066

Defendants

George Gascon

Alexandra Pray

San Francisco District Attorney's Office

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Letter dated 11/30/2018 from Lawis F. Smith, Jr II re: introduction. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lewis Francis Smith, JrII.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN THIS ACTION. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/14/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lewis Francis Smith, Jr. II. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Under the Prisoner Civil Rights Act against George Gascon, Alexandra Pray, San Francisco District Attorney's Office (Filing fee IFPP). Filed byLewis Francis Smith, Jr. II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter dated 11/30/2018 from Lawis F. Smith, Jr II re: introduction. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lewis Francis Smith, JrII.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN THIS ACTION. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/14/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lewis Francis Smith, Jr. II. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Under the Prisoner Civil Rights Act against George Gascon, Alexandra Pray, San Francisco District Attorney's Office (Filing fee IFPP). Filed byLewis Francis Smith, Jr. II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Francisco District Attorney's Office is a litigant