This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2018 at 07:25:47 (UTC).

Smith v. Raven Development LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Raven Development LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01829

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Smith

Defendants

Whelan Development Co.

William Don Brunk

Raven Development LLC

Whelan Security Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George L. Lenard

Attorney at HARRIS AND DOWELL

15400 S. Outer Forty, Suite 202

Chesterfield, MO 63017

Jerryl T. Christmas

9666 Olive Blvd., Suite 370

St. Louis, MO 63132

Defendant Attorneys

Lee M. Baty

Attorney at BATY AND HOLM

4600 Madison Avenue, 210 Plaza West Building

Kansas City, MO 64112-3012

Brian R. Shank

Attorney at EVANS AND DIXON

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63102

Rachel L. Jag

Attorney at EVANS AND DIXON

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63102

Patrick Michael Hunt

Attorney at BATY AND HOLM PC

4600 Madison Avenue, 210 Plaza West Building

Kansas City, MO 64112-3012

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Two Motion to Join Parties due by 1/4/2019. Discovery Completion due by 7/5/2019. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2019. ADR Future Reference 7/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 1/28/2020. Motion in Limine due by 2/7/2020. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/30/2018. (KCB) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#12

(#12) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Whelan Security Co.. . (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick Michael Hunt for Defendant Whelan Security Co.. (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Whelan Security Co..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Raven Development LLC.(Shank, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Raven Development LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L. Jag for Defendant Raven Development LLC. (Jag, Rachel) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Kevin Smith.(BAK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R. Shank for Defendant Raven Development LLC. (Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Raven Development LLC.. (Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

2 #1

Attachment Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Raven Development LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Exhibit b

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 17SL-CC02769-01, Jury Demand,, filed by Raven Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shank, Brian) Modified on 10/26/2018 (BAK). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Two Motion to Join Parties due by 1/4/2019. Discovery Completion due by 7/5/2019. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2019. ADR Future Reference 7/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2019. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 1/28/2020. Motion in Limine due by 2/7/2020. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/30/2018. (KCB) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • (#13) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously scheduled for December 7, 2018 at 11:00 a.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a Case Management Order based upon the parties' Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/30/18. (JEB) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Whelan Security Co.. . (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick Michael Hunt for Defendant Whelan Security Co.. (Hunt, Patrick) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Whelan Security Co..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/29/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/7/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/2/2018. (AFC) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Raven Development LLC.(Shank, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Raven Development LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L. Jag for Defendant Raven Development LLC. (Jag, Rachel) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Kevin Smith.(BAK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R. Shank for Defendant Raven Development LLC. (Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Raven Development LLC.. (Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Raven Development LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Shank, Brian) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 17SL-CC02769-01, Jury Demand,, filed by Raven Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shank, Brian) Modified on 10/26/2018 (BAK). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Whelan Security Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel L. Jag

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian R. Shank

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee M. Baty