This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2018 at 07:52:41 (UTC).

Smith v. Meadow Brook, et al.,

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Meadow Brook, . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven P. Shreder and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Steven P. Shreder

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha Smith

Defendants

Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC

Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC

Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC

Angela Barnes

Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC

Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William J. Ervin, Jr.

Attorney at Ervin & Ervin

Po Box 1449

Mcalester, OK 74502

Blake E. Lynch

Attorney at Wagner & Lynch, PLLC

109 E Washington Ave

Mcalester, OK 74501

Defendant Attorneys

Jason L. Glass

Attorney at Baum Glass & Jayne

401 S Boston Ave, Ste 2300

Tulsa, OK 74103

Tara Zickefoose

Attorney at Baum Glass & Jayne

401 S Boston Ave, Ste 2300

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Zickefoose on behalf of Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Zickefoose, Tara) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#10

(#10) JURY DEMAND by Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason L. Glass on behalf of Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

2 #17

Exhibit 17 - Docket Sheet

2 #16

Exhibit 16 - Amended Petition

2 #15

Exhibit 15 - Order

2 #14

Exhibit 14 - Defendants Reply

2 #13

Exhibit 13 - Def App to Reply

2 #12

Exhibit 12 - Plaintiffs Response

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons - MB - Internediate Care

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons - Meadow Brook

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-18-047 by Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Zickefoose on behalf of Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Zickefoose, Tara) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JURY DEMAND by Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason L. Glass on behalf of Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Glass, Jason) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/10/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1190166 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (Zickefoose, Tara) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk,. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/17/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-18-047 by Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Angela Barnes, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #2, LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, #3 LLC, Meadow Brook Intermediate Care - M.R. Facility, LLC, Meadow Brook Mental Health Day Treatment, LLC, Meadow Brook Residential Facility, LLC by Samantha Smith (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less