This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 07:50:26 (UTC).

Smith v. Love County Sheriff Department

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Love County Sheriff Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James H. Payne and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James H. Payne

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaynise Lanee Smith

Arlington, TX 76015

Defendant

Love County Sheriff Department

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Love County Sheriff Department filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#10

(#10) LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#7

(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/14/2018) (axm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/14/2018) (axm). [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 form(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-315-RAW. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Texas Northern (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 14 15:29:20 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 14 15:20:20 CDT 2018 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Eastern District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/14/2018) (axm) (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/14/2018) (axm). [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Love County Sheriff Department filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (rekc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.