This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2018 at 07:37:47 (UTC).

Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Smith filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00538

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Smith

Defendants

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel Christine Matesic

Attorney at Marcellino & Tyson, PLLC

2820 Selwyn Ave, Suite 350

Charlotte, NC 28209

Bryan Lee Tyson

Attorney at Marcellino & Tyson, PLLC

2820 Selwyn Ave., Suite 350

Charlotte, NC 28209

Defendant Attorney

Hannah Gray Styron Symonds

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1100

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan answer due 12/7/2018; Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/8/2018. (brl) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Gray Styron Symonds on behalf of Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Symonds, Hannah) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Symonds, Hannah). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/07/2018)

2 #1

Summons - Duke Energy

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Duke Energy)(brl) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3829076), filed by Mark Smith.(Matesic, Rachel) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan answer due 12/7/2018; Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/8/2018. (brl) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Gray Styron Symonds on behalf of Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Symonds, Hannah) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Symonds, Hannah). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Duke Energy Long Term Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Duke Energy)(brl) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3829076), filed by Mark Smith.(Matesic, Rachel) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.