This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2018 at 07:12:49 (UTC).

Smith v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Smith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kansas City Southern Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Phil Gilbert and Stephen C. Williams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01412

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

Referral Judge

Stephen C. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael J. Smith

Defendant

Kansas City Southern Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P. Kujawski

Attorney at Kujawski & Marcus, LLC

1331 Park Plaza Drive, Suite 2

O'Fallon, IL 62269-1764

Defendant Attorneys

Erik P. Lewis

Attorney at Thompson Coburn - Belleville

525 West Main Street, Suite 350, P.O. Box 750

Belleville, IL 62220

Paul M. Brown

Attorney at Thompson Coburn - St. Louis, MO

One Us Bank Plaza, Suite 2600

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/6/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#19

(#19) RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/7/2018 (Kujawski, John) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#16

(#16) ENTRY STRICKEN: Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1465-JPG-CJP. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb) Modified on 8/2/2018 (lmb). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 2:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#14

(#14) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/14/2019 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Jury Trial is set for 8/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#13

(#13) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

12 #2

Exhibit B

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1412-JPG-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#5

(#10) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. Docket text modified to reflect correct event only. (slj2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik P. Lewis on behalf of The Kansas City Southern Railway Company (Lewis, Erik) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Brown on behalf of The Kansas City Southern Railway Company (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. . (Lewis, Erik) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/6/2018. (jdh) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/7/2018 (Kujawski, John) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #16 Case Opening Notification. Document entered in wrong case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ENTRY STRICKEN: Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1465-JPG-CJP. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb) Modified on 8/2/2018 (lmb). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Reset Hearings: At he request of the parties, the Scheduling and Discovery Conference is RESET for 8/16/2018 at 3:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 2:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/14/2019 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Jury Trial is set for 8/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. Docket text modified to reflect correct event only. (slj2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Kansas City Southern Railway Company. . (Lewis, Erik) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Kansas City Southern Railway Company re #1 Notice of Removal, to State Court (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • (#7) ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 8/2/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/19/2018. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1412-JPG-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Kansas City Southern by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company.(Brown, Paul) Modified on 7/24/2018 (slj2). (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Erik P. Lewis on behalf of The Kansas City Southern Railway Company (Lewis, Erik) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Brown on behalf of The Kansas City Southern Railway Company (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 18-L-291 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3619856), filed by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less