This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Smith v. Eckstein et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Smith filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Eckstein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01569

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Marques Smith

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

CO Gulley

CO Johnson

CO Mcdonough

Steve Schueler

John and Jane Does

CO Diedrick

Sgt Retzlaff

Lt Koehler

Jay Van Lanen

Sgt Fridel

Susan Peters

Jean Lutsey

CO Meyers

Sgt Rozmarynoski

Sgt Dupont

John Kind

CO Gomm

Scott M Eckstein

Cpt Cushing

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail sent to warden re: #5 Returned as No Mail Receptacle. Resent #5 to Green Bay Correctional Institution, PO Box 19033, Green Bay, WI 54307-9033. (amb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/9/2018. On or before 10/31/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $10.57 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Antonio Smith and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)

#4

(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Antonio Marques Smith re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (mac)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Antonio Marques Smith. (mac)

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Antonio Marques Smith. (mac)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail sent to warden re: #5 Returned as No Mail Receptacle. Resent #5 to Green Bay Correctional Institution, PO Box 19033, Green Bay, WI 54307-9033. (amb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $10.57, receipt number GB4689-5310. The payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Antonio Marques Smith. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/9/2018. On or before 10/31/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $10.57 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Antonio Smith and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from the clerk to Antonio Marques Smith re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antonio Marques Smith. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Antonio Marques Smith. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Antonio Marques Smith. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.