This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:24:55 (UTC).

Smith et al v. Kellogg Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Smith filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kellogg Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01341

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Bouchard

Alice Donovan

Frank Pimental

Johnny Padgett

Kenneth Henrick

Michael Gaddy

Jonathan Jakubiak

Andrew Lescinsky

Albert Byrd, Jr.

Jeff Elia

Ralph Alexander

Todd Bruck

Bryan Malone

Greg Snider

Kenneth Baker

Brian Smith

Melody English

Linda Giguere

David Barnes

Scotty Poarch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J.D. Sweeney

Attorney at Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC

260 Fair Street

Kingston, NY 12401

Jeff Martin Scarborough

Attorney at Gabroy Law Offices

170 S. Green Valley Parkway #280

Henderson, NV 89012

Matthew Thomas Dunn

Attorney at Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC

260 Fair St.

Kingston, NY 12401

Christian James Gabroy

Attorney at Gabroy Law Offices

170 South Green Valley Parkway

Henderson, NV 89012

Alex David Dumas

Attorney at Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC

260 Fair Street

Kingston, NY 12401

Lesley Ann Tse

Attorney at Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC

260 Fair St.

Kingston, NY 12401

Katherine Smith Kennedy

Attorney at Pinsky Smith Fayette & Kennedy LLP

146 Monroe Ctr. St., Nw, Ste. 805

Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2824

Meagan Maureen Rafferty

Attorney at Getman, Sweeney & Dunn, PLLC

260 Fair St.

Kingston, NY 12401

Other Attorneys

James M Nelson

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1201 K Street, Ste. 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Tami D. Cowden

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

10845 Griffith Peak, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

James Norman Boudreau

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (PA)

2001 Market St., 2700 Two Commerce Sq.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Christiana L. Signs

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (PA)

2001 Market St., 2700 Two Commerce Sq.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James M. Nelson

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (CA)

1201 K St., Ste. 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Brian Feeney

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (PA)

2001 Market St., 2700 Two Commerce Sq.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John R. Richards

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (GA)

3333 Piedmont Rd., Ne, Ste. 2500

Atlanta, GA 30305

Bradly A. Nankerville

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP (PA)

2001 Market St., 2700 Two Commerce Sq.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

242 #5

Certificate of Service

242 #4

Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.3(b)

242 #3

Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.1(d)

242 #2

Exhibit A

242 #1

Brief in Support

#242

(#242) MOTION to stay re #227 Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Certification to Facilitate a Limited Period of Class Discovery by defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.1(d), #4 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.3(b), #5 Certificate of Service) (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#241

(#241) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 2/20/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#240

(#240) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#227

(#235) DECLARATION re #227 of Amy Spadaro in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2017)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Brian Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Kellogg Company re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

1 #5

Summons Summons Kellog Sales Company

1 #4

Summons Summons Kellogg Company

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit II-Redacted Paycheck

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit I- Plaintiff's Consent to Joinder

#1

(#9) STRICKEN per #17 Order. (ADR) JOINDER to #1 Complaint; filed by Plaintiffs David W Phillips, Daniel P Muesenfechter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified on 8/7/2017 to restrict access to Exhibit pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

549 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone #241 sent via U.S. Mail to Christiana L. Signs (jlg) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#242) MOTION to stay re #227 Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Certification to Facilitate a Limited Period of Class Discovery by defendants Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.1(d), #4 Certificate of Compliance With Local Rule 7.3(b), #5 Certificate of Service) (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#241) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 2/20/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#240) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kellogg Company, Kellogg Sales Company (Boudreau, James) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement #239 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Christiana L. Signs (ems) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#239) ORDER that Defendants Kellogg Company and Kellogg Sales Company file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#238) NOTICE re #148 , #169 of Withdrawal of Consent to Sues by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#237) DECLARATION re #227 of Lesley Tse in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#236) DECLARATION re #227 of William Vehlewald in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#235) DECLARATION re #227 of Amy Spadaro in Support by plaintiff Brian Smith (Dunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
235 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STRICKEN per #17 Order. (ADR) JOINDER to #1 Complaint; filed by Plaintiffs David W Phillips, Daniel P Muesenfechter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified on 8/7/2017 to restrict access to Exhibit pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STRICKEN per #17 Order. (ADR) JOINDER to #1 Complaint; filed by Plaintiff Scotty Poarch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Gabroy, Christian) Modified on 8/7/2017 to restrict access to Exhibit pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Kellogg Sales Company re #1 Complaint. (MMM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Brian Smith. (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 7/14/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Brian Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Gabroy, Christian) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • (#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael J.D. and Alex Dumas to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/27/2017. (no image attached) (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Kellogg Company re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4689081), filed by Brian Smith. Proof of service due by 10/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I- Consent to Joinder, #2 Exhibit II-Redacted Paycheck, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Gabroy, Christian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 07/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less