This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2019 at 08:03:06 (UTC).

Swartwood v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 Swartwood filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03060

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Merton Smartwood

Thomas Merton Swartwood

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J Engler

Attorney at Cambridge Law Firm PLC

707 Poplar Street, Po Box 496, Ecf

Atlantic, IA 50022

Robert James Engler

707 Poplar Street

Atlantic, IA 50022

Karl E Osterhout

Attorney at Osterhout Disability Law LLC

521 Cedar Way, Suite 200, ***Ecf

Oakmont, PA 15139

Defendant Attorney

Jacob A Schunk

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

111 7Th Avenue Se, Box 1, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Merton Swartwood. The #7 Order is rescinded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/29/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#7

(#7) (RESCINDED) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2806829) on behalf of Plaintiff. This motion fails to comply with LR 83.d.4, in that associate counsel has not entered an appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/16/18. (ksy) Modified on 11/29/2018,rescinded per #8 Order (skm). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's office is directed to detach and file the complaint attached at Doc. 1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/6/2018. (skm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Availability: A United States Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case. Please read the attached AO 85 form. The completed form may be submitted to ecfmail@iand.uscourts.gov. (src) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Merton Swartwood (Osterhout, Karl) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Merton Swartwood. The #7 Order is rescinded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/29/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (RESCINDED) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2806829) on behalf of Plaintiff. This motion fails to comply with LR 83.d.4, in that associate counsel has not entered an appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/16/18. (ksy) Modified on 11/29/2018,rescinded per #8 Order (skm). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (skm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Thomas Merton Swartwood. Dismissal Deadline 2/17/2019 (filed by Clerk per #4 Order). (skm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's office is directed to detach and file the complaint attached at Doc. 1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 11/6/2018. (skm) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/5/2018. (mmc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2806829) by Plaintiff Thomas Merton Swartwood (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing WDPA) (Osterhout, Karl) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Merton Swartwood (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Engler, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.