Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2018 at 07:30:36 (UTC).

Smartphonerecords, LLC et al v. University of South Carolina, The et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 Smartphonerecords, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against University of South Carolina, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02333

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SmartPhoneRecords, LLC

Damion Hollomon

Defendants

Christian Thibault

Donald Tomlin, Jr.

52 App, Inc.

T Minus 6, LLC

Laura Corder

Tradeversity, Inc.

Harry Huntley

Michael Meyers

The South Carolina Jobs-Economic Development Authority

Harris Pastides

Kelly Truesdale

Sowell & Grey and Associates

USC/Columbia Technology Incubator

Steve Leicht

Tina Cundari

Charles Hardaway, Jr.

Brendan Lee

William Kirkland

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Fazio

Attorney at Fazio Micheletti LLP

2410 Camino Ramon, Suite 315

San Ramon, CA 94583

Dina Elizabeth Micheletti

Attorney at Fazio Micheletti LLP

2410 Camino Ramon, Suite 315

San Ramon, CA 94583

Mary McMullen Taylor

Attorney at Mullen Taylor LLC

1230 Richland Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Joseph Nagle

Attorney at Murphy Rosen LLP

100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

David Eric Rosen

Attorney at Murphy Rosen and Cohen LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Stephen Patrick Randall

Attorney at Burnham Brown

1901 Harrison Street, 14Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Thomas Michael Downey

Attorney at Burnham Brown

1901 Harrison Street, 11Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

William A. Munoz

Attorney at Murphy Pearson Bradley and Feeney

520 Capitol Mall, Suite 250

Sacramento, CA 95814

Christopher John Bakes

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

2020 W. El Camino Avenue, Suite 700

Sacramento, CA 95833

Bryan Paul Sugar, PHV

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaaard & Smith, LLP

550 W. Adams St., Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

87 #3

Exhibit Filing

87 #2

Exhibit Filing

87 #1

Exhibit Cover Letter

#87

(#87) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC re #83 Notice of Appearance, #84 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Taylor, Mary) (Main Document 87 replaced on 8/30/2018) (cbru, ). Modified to link correct event to associated event and to edit text on 8/30/2018 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#84

(#84) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC (Taylor, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#83

(#83) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary McMullen Taylor on behalf of Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC (Taylor, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#80

(#80) NOTICE OF TRANSFER (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

79 #1

*Restricted*

#79

(#79) Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00479. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#78

(#78) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/18, GRANTING defendants' motions to transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the District of South Carolina. Defendants motions to dismiss are DENIED as MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#6

SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#5

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/2017 DENYING #4 , #5 Motions to Proceed IFP without prejudice to their renewal with all entries on the form completed; GRANTING the plaintiffs thirty (30) days to renew their IFP applications in proper form or to pay the filing fee; CAUTIONING the plaintiffs that a failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#4

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/2017 DENYING #4 , #5 Motions to Proceed IFP without prejudice to their renewal with all entries on the form completed; GRANTING the plaintiffs thirty (30) days to renew their IFP applications in proper form or to pay the filing fee; CAUTIONING the plaintiffs that a failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#3

SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/16/2017)

#2

(#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/15/17. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/16/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits A-AAA

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-AAA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 03/06/2017)

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 85. Reason: Attachments within main document. Corrected Filing Document Number #87 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC re #83 Notice of Appearance, #84 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Taylor, Mary) (Main Document 87 replaced on 8/30/2018) (cbru, ). Modified to link correct event to associated event and to edit text on 8/30/2018 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC (Taylor, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary McMullen Taylor on behalf of Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon, SmartPhoneRecords, LLC (Taylor, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #80 Notice Other placed in U.S. Mail to Dina Elizabeth Micheletti, Jeffrey L. Fazio, Stephen Patrick Randall, Thomas Michael Downey, David Eric Rosen, Mark Joseph Nagle, Bryan Paul Sugar, Christopher John Bakes (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) NOTICE OF TRANSFER (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00479. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/18, GRANTING defendants' motions to transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the District of South Carolina. Defendants motions to dismiss are DENIED as MOOT. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and/or Transfer (ECF Nos. #58 , #66 , & #67 ) are SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 6/15/2018 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) REPLY by defendants to #70 Opposition to Motion to dismiss . (Randall, Stephen) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • RECEIPT number #CAE200084211 $400.00 fbo Reyna Carrasco by Reyna Carrasco on 8/28/2017. (Washington, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/24/2017 DENYING #4 , #5 Motions to Proceed IFP without prejudice to their renewal with all entries on the form completed; GRANTING the plaintiffs thirty (30) days to renew their IFP applications in proper form or to pay the filing fee; CAUTIONING the plaintiffs that a failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Damion Hollomon. (Nguyen, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Reyna Carrasco. (Nguyen, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/15/17. (Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 08/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants by Reyna Carrasco, Damion Hollomon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-AAA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Michel, G.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/21/2018.] (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey L. Fazio