This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2017 at 02:48:28 (UTC).

Smallwood v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 Smallwood filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against The Goodyear Tire Rubber Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01311

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Renee Smallwood

Defendants

The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Echols Harris

Attorney at Sico Hoelscher Harris & Braugh LLP

802 N Caranacahua, Ste 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Louie Jefferson Cook

Attorney at Sico Hoelscher et al

802 N Carancahua, Ste 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

David Bruce Weinstein

Attorney at Weinstein Tippets and Little LLP

7500 San Felipe, Ste 500

Houston, TX 77063

Thad Kingston Jenks

Attorney at Weinstein Tippetts & Little LLP

7500 San Felipe, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77063

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

17 #1

*Restricted*

#17

(#17) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00032. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 05/17/2017)

15 #17

Proposed Order

15 #16

Exhibit 16

15 #13

Exhibit 13

15 #12

Exhibit 12

15 #9

Exhibit 9

15 #8

Exhibit 8

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed.(Jenks, Thad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/17/2017)

#6

(#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed.(Jenks, Thad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/17/2017)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angela Renee Smallwood, filed.(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/09/2017)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. filed by Angela Renee Smallwood.(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/06/2017)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Hayden Head(Signed by Judge Hayden Head) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/25/2017)

2 #1

Summons in a Civil Action

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action)(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/24/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17830043) filed by Angela Renee Smallwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/24/2017)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00032. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas - Dallas Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 5/16/2017, filed. (arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Change Venue to ND/TX - Dallas.(Signed by Judge Hayden Head) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue to Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Proposed Order)(Weinstein, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT and PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #13 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Agreed Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order (Signed by Judge Hayden Head) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 04/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Agreed Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jenks, Thad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 04/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER ESTABLISHING DEADLINES(Signed by Judge Hayden Head) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 04/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hayden Head. Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2017. No pending motions at this time; but Defense counsel announces he will be filing a Motion to Transfer Venue to Dallas. The Court orders the parties to file initial disclosures and then confer regarding dates/deadlines. Initial Disclosures due by 4/19/2017. Appearances: Louie Jefferson Cook, David Echols Harris, Thad Kingston Jenks.(Digital # 11:03 - 11:23)(ERO: Verlinda Rios), filed.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 04/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order, filed.(Weinstein, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 04/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Weinstein, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 03/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed.(Jenks, Thad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed.(Jenks, Thad) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. filed by Angela Renee Smallwood.(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angela Renee Smallwood, filed.(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. filed by Angela Renee Smallwood.(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/5/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Hayden Head(Signed by Judge Hayden Head) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by: First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action)(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17830043) filed by Angela Renee Smallwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 01/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Louie Jefferson Cook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Echols Harris