This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 16:03:54 (UTC).

Slay v. IB Travelin, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 Slay filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IB Travelin, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02728

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Ann Hunt Slay

Defendants

IB Travelin, Inc.

Domiruth Travel Services

IB Travelin, Inc. formerly doing business as Iberoamericana Travel System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carl I. Jacobson

Attorney at WALK COOK & LAKEY, PLC

431 South Main Street, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38103

William B. Walk, Jr.

Attorney at WALK, COOK, SMITH & LAKEY PLC

431 South Main, Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

William David Darnell

Attorney at Leitner Williams Dooley & Napolitan

80 Monroe Avenue, Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

Tracy A. Overstreet

Attorney at LEITNER WILLIAMS DOOLEY & NAPOLITAN, PLLC

Brinkley Plaza, Suite 800, 80 Monroe Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by William David Darnell on behalf of IB Travelin, Inc. (Darnell, William) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

13 #4

Affidavit

13 #3

Exhibit

13 #2

Exhibit

13 #1

Memorandum

#13

(#13) MOTION Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Domiruth Travel Services, SAC proposed order submitted by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(Walk, William) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A. Overstreet on behalf of IB Travelin, Inc. (Overstreet, Tracy) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. IB Travelin, Inc. waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Walk, William) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to IB Travelin, Inc. on 10/24/2018 by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. Waiver of Service due by 11/23/2018. (Walk, William) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Domiruth Travel Services. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to IB Travelin, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

1 #3

Summons for Domiruth

1 #2

Summons for IB Travelin, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS AND WRONGFUL DEATH against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2907338), filed by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for IB Travelin, Inc., #3 Summons for Domiruth)(Jacobson, Carl) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • Docket(#15) ******OOPS****** Please disregard 11/14/2018 (jld). Modified on 11/14/2018 (jld). (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by William David Darnell on behalf of IB Travelin, Inc. (Darnell, William) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION Alternative Service of Process on Defendant Domiruth Travel Services, SAC proposed order submitted by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(Walk, William) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A. Overstreet on behalf of IB Travelin, Inc. (Overstreet, Tracy) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. IB Travelin, Inc. waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Walk, William) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to IB Travelin, Inc. on 10/24/2018 by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. Waiver of Service due by 11/23/2018. (Walk, William) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by William Walk, Jr on behalf of Barbara Ann Hunt Slay (Walk, William) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued, has been filed. The name and address of the attorney the answer is to sent to is missing form the summons. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Domiruth Travel Services. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to IB Travelin, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS AND WRONGFUL DEATH against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2907338), filed by Barbara Ann Hunt Slay. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for IB Travelin, Inc., #3 Summons for Domiruth)(Jacobson, Carl) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Iberoamericana Travel System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl I. Jacobson