This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2018 at 05:52:33 (UTC).

Slaughter v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Slaughter filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vannessa Slaughter

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Timothy Michael Clark

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

2860 Michelle Drive, Suite 220

Irvine, CA 92807

Defendant Attorney

Robert Bruce Hurley, Jr

Attorney at King and Spalding

1100 Louisiana, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

13 #1

*Restricted*

#13

(#13) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:17-cv-03321. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#12

(#12) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to Eastern District of Kentucky to be included in MDL Docket No. 2809. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#11

(#11) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 11/15/2017, answer due 12/6/2017; McKesson Corporation served on 11/8/2017, answer due 11/29/2017, filed.(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#4

(#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 11/8/2017, answer due 11/29/2017, filed.(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19143739) filed by Vannessa Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (TDA) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:17-cv-03321. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ docket sheet (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Kentucky. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to Eastern District of Kentucky to be included in MDL Docket No. 2809. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 11/15/2017, answer due 12/6/2017; McKesson Corporation served on 11/8/2017, answer due 11/29/2017, filed.(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, filed.(Hurley, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 11/8/2017, answer due 11/29/2017, filed.(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19143739) filed by Vannessa Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from txsd on 2/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less