This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 08:14:06 (UTC).

State of Tennessee ex rel Slatery et al v. Phillips 66 Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 State of Tennessee ex rel Slatery filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Phillips 66 Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00425

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shari Meghreblian

Herbert H Slatery

State of Tennessee

Defendants

Phillips 66 Company

Conoco, Inc.

ConocoPhillips Company

American Agricultural Chemical Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilson Sinclair Buntin

Attorney at State of Tennessee, Office of Attorney General

Po Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

J Peter Murrey

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General and Reporter

Po Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202

Defendant Attorneys

Dalton Mott

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP (Kansas)

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

James F Thompson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP (Kansas)

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Shari Meghreblian, Herbert H Slatery, State of Tennessee (Murrey, J) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian, State of Tennessee. Phillips 66 Company waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Murrey, J) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian, State of Tennessee. ConocoPhillips Company waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Murrey, J) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dalton Mott (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to United States of America v. Phillips 66 Company, et al., No. 3:18-CV-421. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 10/10/18. (JBR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Peter Murrey by State of Tennessee. (JBR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel Buntin. Informational only. (SAC, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC, )Notice mailed to attorney Murrey. (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #2

Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3780979.), filed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Buntin, Wilson) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Shari Meghreblian, Herbert H Slatery, State of Tennessee (Murrey, J) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian, State of Tennessee. Phillips 66 Company waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Murrey, J) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian, State of Tennessee. ConocoPhillips Company waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Murrey, J) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/13/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Mott and Thompson on 11/14/2018 (JBR). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Phillips 66 Company . (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Phillips 66 Company . (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dalton Mott (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (BDG, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/10/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to J Peter Murrey on 10/11/2018 (JBR). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by State of Tennessee (JBR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to United States of America v. Phillips 66 Company, et al., No. 3:18-CV-421. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 10/10/18. (JBR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Peter Murrey by State of Tennessee. (JBR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel Buntin. Informational only. (SAC, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC, )Notice mailed to attorney Murrey. (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3780979.), filed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Buntin, Wilson) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conoco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIP 66 COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson Sinclair Buntin