This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 07:25:48 (UTC).

SLANE v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 SLANE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-16620

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADGE MELANY SLANE

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE A. PARFITT

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

4900 Seminary Road, Suite 650

Alexandria, VA 22311

PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

218 Commerce Street, P.O. Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

John Chadwick Coots

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON, L.L.P.

1155 F Street, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20004

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at DRINKER, BIDDLE & REATH, LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932-1047

JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Thomas Tobias Locke

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

975 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2688

THOMAS T. LOCKE

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

975 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1454

Katherine Ondeck

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

1300 I Street, Nw, Suite 825

Washington, DC 20005

MARK K. SILVER

Attorney at COUGHLIN DUFFY LLP

350 Mount Kemble Avenue, Po Box 1917

Morristown, NJ 07962-1917

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (LOCKE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#21

(#21) Short Form Complaint by MADGE MELANY SLANE. (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of MADGE MELANY SLANE (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#18

(#18) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MADGE MELANY SLANE. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-1510 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #5

Summons Personal Care Products Council

1 #4

Summons Imerys Talc America, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.

1 #2

Summons Johnson & Johnson

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5659367) filed by MADGE MELANY SLANE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Imerys Talc America, Inc., #5 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (LOCKE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Short Form Complaint by MADGE MELANY SLANE. (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of MADGE MELANY SLANE (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (dm ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION to Stay by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Coots Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC..(Coots, John) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (Ondeck, Katherine) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ondeck, Katherine) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MADGE MELANY SLANE. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-1510 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5659367) filed by MADGE MELANY SLANE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Imerys Talc America, Inc., #5 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.