This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:47:05 (UTC).

Slampak et al v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Slampak filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Janie Slampak

Phillip Slampak

Defendant

Nationwide Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob M. Robinson, Sr

Attorney at Robinson Law Offices

1140 Market St

Wheeling, WV 26003

Brent E. Robinson

Attorney at Robinson Law Offices

1140 Market St

Wheeling, WV 26003

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick C. Timony

Attorney at BOWLES RICE

P. O. Box 1386

Charleston, WV 25325

Ashley Hardesty Odell

Attorney at Bowles, Rice, LLP - Morgantown

125 Granville Square, Suite 400

Morgantown, WV 26501

Patrick Craig Timony

Attorney at Bowles, Rice, McDavid, Graff & Love - Charleston

Po Box 1386, 600 Quarrier St.

Charleston, WV 25325-1386

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder & Amendments due by 7/30/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Motions due by 10/15/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/24/2019. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 12/30/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/14/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/29/18. (lmm) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Odell, Ashley) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley Hardesty Odell (Odell, Ashley) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/17/2018 with non-fillable form) (lmm). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Timony, Patrick) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Janie Slampak, Phillip Slampak. (Robinson, Jacob) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Allied Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Allied Holdings (Delaware), Inc., Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Company of America.. (Odell, Ashley) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

4 #3

Exhibit 3

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Nationwide Insurance Company of America re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Timony, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Timony, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#2

(#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/19/2018; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2018; Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/17/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - WV SOS Online Data Service

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court docket

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court papers

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Wetzel County, (case number 18-C-38). Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2665921, filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court papers, #2 Exhibit B - State Court docket, #3 Exhibit C - WV SOS Online Data Service, #4 Exhibit D - Release, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder & Amendments due by 7/30/2019. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Motions due by 10/15/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/24/2019. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 12/30/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/14/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 10/29/18. (lmm) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Odell, Ashley) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley Hardesty Odell (Odell, Ashley) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/17/2018 with non-fillable form) (lmm). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Timony, Patrick) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Janie Slampak, Phillip Slampak. (Robinson, Jacob) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Allied Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Allied Holdings (Delaware), Inc., Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Company of America.. (Odell, Ashley) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Nationwide Insurance Company of America re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Timony, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Timony, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/19/2018; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2018; Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 9/17/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Wetzel County, (case number 18-C-38). Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2665921, filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court papers, #2 Exhibit B - State Court docket, #3 Exhibit C - WV SOS Online Data Service, #4 Exhibit D - Release, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less