This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2022 at 19:26:38 (UTC).

SKWS Enterprises, Inc. v. Amber Levonchuck et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 SKWS Enterprises, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Amber Levonchuck. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-03327

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKWS Enterprises, Inc.

Defendants

Amber Levonchuck

Walter Mosley

Jason Robinson

Amber Rose

Does 1-10, inclusive

Tokio Los Angeles LLC

Ace of Diamond, Inc.

Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sagar Parikh

Attorney at Beverly Hills Law Corp PC

433 North Camden Drive 6Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Michael L Lavetter

Attorney at Scheper Kim and Harris LLP

800 West Sixth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Patrick L. Rendon

Attorney at Lamb and Kawakami LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shane W. Tseng

Attorney at LKP Global Law LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Keith G Bremer

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown and O'Meara LLP

20320 Sw Birch Street 2Nd Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Alexander Giannetto

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown and O'Meara LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Elliot Albert Rosenberger

Attorney at Law Office of Elliot Rosenberger

7080 Hollywood Boulevard, 11Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Joshua M Biletsky

Attorney at Biletsky Rosenberger

7080 Hollywood Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90028

 

Court Documents

#38

37 #1

Supplement Notice of Lodgment Exhibits F-M

37 #37

Main Document

36 #4

Declaration Proof of Service

36 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

36 #2

Supplement Request for Judicial Notice

36 #1

Memorandum Points & Authorities

36 #36

Main Document

35 #4

Declaration Proof of Service

35 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

35 #2

Supplement Request for Judicial Notice

35 #1

Memorandum Points & Authorities

35 #35

Main Document

34 #4

Declaration Proof of Service

34 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Docket(#61) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal) (gk) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Docket(#60) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Manuel L. Real: THE COURT having been advised by the counsel for the parties that the action has been settled as to the remaining defendants in this action #58 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 90 days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set in this action are hereby vacated. The Court reserves its jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the settlement. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff SKWS Enterprises, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Ace of Diamond, Inc., Amber Levonchuck, Walter Mosley, Jason Robinson. (Lavetter, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE of Settlement in Principle and Joint Request to Discharge or Continue Order to Show Cause re Dismissal filed by Plaintiff SKWS Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lavetter, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Docket(#57) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution and for Failure to Comply With the Court's Order Re: Notice to Counsel by Judge Manuel L. Real. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/1/2018. Failure to timely comply will result in the dismissal of this case. (cch) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Docket(#56) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT JASON ROBINSON by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Bremer, Whyte, Brown & O'Meara's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant Jason Robinson #52 is DENIED. (gk) (Entered: 05/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Docket(#55) TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Defendant Jason Robinson's motion of Alex M. Giannetto to Withdraw as Attorney #52 set for hearing on May 7, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of May 7, 2018 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #24 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC, Tokio Los Angeles LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof of Service)(Rosenberger, Elliot) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Effective, April 11, 2018, Judge Chooljian will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse ("Roybal Building"), located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 750 on the 7th floor of the Roybal Building. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside of the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Building. Paper civil and criminal documents exempted from electronic filing shall be filed in Room 180 on the Terrace Level of the Roybal Building. Magistrate Judge Chooljian's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Kerri Hays, may be reached at (213) 894-2921. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Alex M. Giannetto to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Jason Robinson. Motion set for hearing on 5/7/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points & Authorities; Declaration of Alex M. Giannetto, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Proof of Service) (Giannetto, Alexander) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (clee) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:17-cv-03327 R(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 05/04/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Norris, Matthew) (Entered: 05/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Amber Levonchuck, Walter Mosley, Jason Robinson. (esa) (Entered: 05/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa) (Entered: 05/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation. (Norris, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation, (Norris, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation. (Norris, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation. (Norris, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19787395 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation. (Attorney Matthew James Norris added to party SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (pty:pla))(Norris, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOKIO LOS ANGELES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SKWS ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAHUENGA BICYCLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sagar Parikh