This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2023 at 06:53:40 (UTC).

Skullcandy v. Zeltzer et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Skullcandy filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Zeltzer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul M. Warner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00929

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul M. Warner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skullcandy

Defendants

Zachary Zeltzer

Lauren Zeltzer

ZMZ Global

Dialectic Distribution

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

4 #1

Copy of Complaint

#4

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (las) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (las) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Lauren Zeltzer served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Dialectic Distribution served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to ZMZ Global served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Zachary Zeltzer served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dialectic Distribution. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to ZMZ Global. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lauren Zeltzer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Zachary Zeltzer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/5/2018. (las) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (rks) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Daren s. Garcia, Rodney A. Holaday, for Plaintiff Skullcandy (rks) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3157898) filed by Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Skullcandy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rks) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less