This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 18:00:46 (UTC).

Skullcandy v. AHCF Trading et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Skullcandy filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against AHCF Trading. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brooke C. Wells. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00930

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brooke C. Wells

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skullcandy

Defendants

Chana Friedman

Aron Schwartz

Kiddie Hub

AHCF Trading

Art Chocolatier

Art Chocolatier a New York corporation, on www.amazon.com doing business as HLKT

Aron Schwartz an individual, on www.amazon.com doing business as HLKT

AHCF Trading a New York corporation, on www.amazon.com doing business as HLKT

Kiddie Hub a New York corporation, on www.amazon.com doing business as HLKT

Chana Friedman an individual, on www.amazon.com doing business as HLKT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Rodney A. Holaday

Attorney at VORYS SATER SEYMOUR AND PEASE LLP

52 E Gay St

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#14

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Exhibit Copy of Complaint

#4

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Aron Schwartz served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy (Call, Monica) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rodney A. Holaday for Skullcandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/21/2018. (las) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rodney A. Holaday , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3169513, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Art Chocolatier served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Kiddie Hub served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to Chana Friedman served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skullcandy as to AHCF Trading served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Aron Schwartz. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chana Friedman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kiddie Hub. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Art Chocolatier. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to AHCF Trading. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys Daren S. Garcia and Rodney A. Holaday, for Plaintiff Skullcandy (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3157965) filed by Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Call, Monica) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Skullcandy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Skullcandy is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica S. Call

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney Alan Holaday