This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2018 at 07:22:56 (UTC).

Sinistaj v. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Sinistaj filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Victoria A. Roberts and David R. Grand. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12289

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Djon Sinistaj

Defendants

Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Department of Homeland Security

Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office Director

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Caridad Pastor Cardinale

Attorney at Pastor Assoc.

525 E. Big Beaver Road, Suite 206

Troy, MI 48083

Defendant Attorney

Vanessa Miree Mays

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

211 W. Fort Street, Suite 2001

Detroit, MI 48226-3211

 

Court Documents

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Djon Sinistaj. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/23/2018 (CPin) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vanessa Miree Mays appearing on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office Director (Mays, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Djon Sinistaj served on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Regarding Deportation Emergency Stay Request filed by Djon Sinistaj against All Defendants, Receipt No: 0645-6827063 - Fee: 5 dollars. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.