This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 15:09:50 (UTC).

Sinco Technologies Pte Ltd. v. Sinco Electronics (Dongguan) Co. Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 Sinco Technologies Pte Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sinco Electronics Dongguan Co Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth D. Laporte, Edward M. Chen and Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-05517

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Spero

Presiding Judges

Elizabeth D. Laporte

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Sinco Technologies Pte Ltd.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Sinco Electronics (Dongguan) Co. Ltd.

Ng Cher Yong

Liew Yew Soon

Xingke Electronics (Dongguan) Co. Ltd.

Cy Ng

Mark Liew

Xingke Electronics Technology Co. Ltd

Sincoo Electronics Technology Co. Ltd

Mui Lang Tjoa

Respondent

Jeffrey L Fazio

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Special Master

Hon. James Ware (Ret.)

San Francisco, CA 94111

Not Classified By Court

Apple Inc.

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lael D. Andara

Attorney at Ropers Majeski PC

545 Middlefield Road, Suite 175

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Marie Elizabeth Sobieski

Attorney at Ropers Majeski PC

1001 Marshall Street, 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063

Ernest E Price

Attorney at Ropers Majeski PC

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mario A. Iskander

Attorney at The Law Offices of Hani S. Bushra

16541 Gothard

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Michelle Guadalupe Trevino

Attorney at Ropers Majeski PC

1001 Marshall Street, 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063

Robin Marie Pearson

Attorney at Ropers Majeski

1904 Olympic Boulevard, Suite 8

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Respondent Attorneys

Dania Qahoush

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Douglas Andrew Winthrop

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Jeremy T. Kamras

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Jessica Lim Gillotte

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jing Wang

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real

Joseph Richard Farris

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kathleen Alparce Vasquez

Attorney at WHGC, P.L.C.

1301 Dove Street, Suite 1050

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Keliang Zhu

Attorney at DeHeng Law Offices PC

7901 Stoneridge Drive, #208

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Neesha Chhina

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Robbin Lee

Attorney at Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington D.C., DC 20001-3743

Jeffrey Louis Fazio

Attorney at Fazio Micheletti LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 400

Oakland, CA 94607

Edwin Ken Prather

Attorney at Prather Law Offices

245 Fifth Street, Suite 103

San Francisco, CA 94103

George Brent Sims

Attorney at Hines, Hampton, Pelanda, LLP

34 Executive Park, Ste 260

Irvine, CA 92614

Special Master Attorney

James Ware

Attorney at JAMS

2 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#617

RESTRICTED

#616

RESTRICTED

#615

RESTRICTED

#614

RESTRICTED

#613

RESTRICTED

#612

RESTRICTED

#611

RESTRICTED

#526

(#616) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 17, held on 11-17-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #525 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #526 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Related documents(s) #525 , #526 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

#525

(#616) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 17, held on 11-17-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #525 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #526 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Related documents(s) #525 , #526 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

1 #23

Summons for NG CHER YONG aka CY NG

1 #22

Summons for XINGKE ELECTRONICS

1 #21

Summons for SINCO ELECTRONICS

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1,482 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#617) Transcript of Master Index of Jury Trial Proceedings held from 11-1-2021 through 11-17-2021 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#616) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 17, held on 11-17-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #525 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #526 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Related documents(s) #525 , #526 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#615) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 10, held on 11-16-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#614) Redaction of #613 Transcript,, (Related documents(s) #613 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#613) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 9, held on 11-15-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#612) Redaction of #611 Transcript,, (Related documents(s) #611 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#611) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 8, held on 11-12-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#610) Redaction of #609 Transcript,, (Related documents(s) #609 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#609) Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 7, held on 11-10-2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2022. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#608) Redaction of #607 Transcript,, (Related documents(s) #607 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/21/2021) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
617 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ERRATA re #1 Complaint,,,, Signature Pages to Complaint and Demand for Jury by Sinco Technologies Pte Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Signature to Demand for Jury)(Andara, Lael) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequested by Telephone from Attorney Lael Andara Copies of Complaint and Exhibits to be forwarded to the Trademark Office. Re #1 Complaint & Exhibits (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Liew Yew Soon. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Ng Cher Yong. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Xingke Electronis (Dongguan) Co. Ltd. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sinco Electronics (Dongguan) Co. Ltd. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/26/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/22/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by SINCO TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD. E-filer is informed in the future not to enter parties in all capitalized lettering. Attorney did not sign the complaint. E-filer is instructed to e-file separately the Attorney's signature pages "(ONLY)" that are missing on the complaint. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/6/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT: (1) TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (15 U.S.C. 1114); (2) FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN (15 U.S.C. 1125(a)); (3) FALSE ADVERTISING (15 U.S.C. 1125(a)); (4) TRADEMARK DILUTION (15 U.S.C. 1125(c); (5) COMMON LAW TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT & UNFAIR COMPETITION; and (6) STATE STATUTORY UNFAIR COMPETITION (Cal.Bus.& Prof 17200); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11741713.). Filed by Sinco Technologies Pte, Ltd., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Civil Cover Sheet, #21 Proposed Summons for Sinco Electronis, #22Proposed Summons for Xingke Electronics, #23 Proposed Summons for Ng Cher Yong #24 Proposed Summons for Liew Yew Soon; (Andara, Lael) (Filed on 9/22/2017) ATTORNEY'S SIGNATURE MISSING Modified on 9/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sinco Technologies PTE LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant