This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 07:56:55 (UTC).

Sims v. Resources for Human Development, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Sims filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Resources for Human Development, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02664

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Sims

Defendant

Resources for Human Development, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Donna L. Russell

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edgar Davison

6000 Poplar Ave. Suite 250

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorneys

Yasmin A. Mohammad

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART - Memphis

6410 Poplar Ave., Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

W. Chris Harrison, Esq.

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART - Memphis

6410 Poplar Ave., Suite 300

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING. The SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET on FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 9, 2018 at 9:30 A.M. before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. is CANCELLED and may be reset by separate notice. (jl) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Resources for Human Development, Inc. (Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET to Friday, 11/09/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 11/01/18) (zsf) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Resources for Human Development, Inc..(Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#8

(#8) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 11/01/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Chris Harrison, Esq on behalf of Resources for Human Development, Inc. (Harrison, W.) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie Pompey

1 #2

Summons Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resources for Human Development, Inc. from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1205 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2889431), filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie Pompey)(Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING. The SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET on FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 9, 2018 at 9:30 A.M. before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. is CANCELLED and may be reset by separate notice. (jl) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Resources for Human Development, Inc. (Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET to Friday, 11/09/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (Reset from 11/01/18) (zsf) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Resources for Human Development, Inc..(Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 11/01/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Chris Harrison, Esq on behalf of Resources for Human Development, Inc. (Harrison, W.) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resources for Human Development, Inc. from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1205 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2889431), filed by Resources for Human Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Stephanie Pompey)(Mohammad, Yasmin) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less