This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2019 at 07:38:30 (UTC).

Simmons v. Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Simmons filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ewing Werlein, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04382

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivy Simmons

Defendant

Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Loren G Klitsas

Attorney at Klitsas Vercher PC

550 Westcott, Ste 570

Houston, TX 77007

Jared Willie Capps

Attorney at Klitsas and Vercher PC

550 Westcott, Ste 570

Houston, TX 77007

Margaret Jackson Graeff

Attorney at Klitsas & Vercher, PC

550 Westcott, Suite 570

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Robin Rene Gant

Attorney at Mayer LLP

750 N St Paul Street, Ste 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Zachary T. Mayer

Attorney at Mayer LLP

750 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 700, Suite 3700, Dallas

Dallas, TX 75201

Kevin Patrick Riley

Attorney at Mayer LLP

4400 Post Oak Parkway, Suite 2850

Houston, TX 77027

Raul Ivan Saenz

Attorney at Mayer LLP

4400 Post Oak Parkway, Suite 2850

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ivy Simmons, filed.(Graeff, Margaret) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC, filed.(Saenz, Raul) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 02:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2018-72464 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21305932) filed by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saenz, Raul) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ivy Simmons, filed.(Graeff, Margaret) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC, filed.(Saenz, Raul) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 02:30 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2018-72464 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21305932) filed by Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saenz, Raul) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Family Dollar Stores of Georgia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loren G Klitsas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared W. Capps