This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:53:12 (UTC).

Silva v. Farrell

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Silva filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Farrell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan, William E. Smith and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00650

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judges

William E. Smith

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wayne A. Silva

New Bedford, MA 02740

Defendant

Robert M. Farrell

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER ADOPTING #8 Report and Recommendations. Except for a Notice of Appeal and a single Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60, Plaintiff is hereby enjoined from filing any further motions or other documents in this matter without first obtaining permission from a judge of this Court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#8

(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. I recommend that, except for a notice of appeal and a single motion for relief from judgment or order in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60, the Court enter an injunction barring Plaintiff from filing any further motions or other documents in this matterwithout first obtaining permission from a judge of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/15/2019. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by Clerk of Court on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#3

TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Report and Recommendations - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#9

(#9) OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter from Wayne Silva (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

No Description Available

#2

TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Report and Recommendations - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by Clerk of Court on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER ADOPTING #8 Report and Recommendations. Except for a Notice of Appeal and a single Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60, Plaintiff is hereby enjoined from filing any further motions or other documents in this matter without first obtaining permission from a judge of this Court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated in the report and recommendation issued today, the motion for reconsideration is denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/15/2019. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. I recommend that, except for a notice of appeal and a single motion for relief from judgment or order in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60, the Court enter an injunction barring Plaintiff from filing any further motions or other documents in this matterwithout first obtaining permission from a judge of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/15/2019. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by Clerk of Court on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Report and Recommendations - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Wayne Silva (McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Wayne A. Silva, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne A. Silva. I recommend that the complaint be summarily dismissed becauseit fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to the Rooker-Feldman doctrine, venue in this Court is improper and the only defendant is immune from suit. Consistent with this recommendation, I further recommend that the IFP motion be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/11/2018. (Saucier, Martha) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Case reassigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. Chief Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-95-WES-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-95-WES-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less