This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2018 at 07:03:50 (UTC).

SILCOTEK CORPORATION v. ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 SILCOTEK CORPORATION filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Abrams and S. James Otero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03274

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

Presiding Judge

S. James Otero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILCOTEK CORPORATION

Defendant

ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christian D Ehret

Attorney at The Webb Law Firm

One Gateway Center, 420 Ft Duquesne Boulevard Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Cecilia R Dickson

Attorney at The Webb Law Firm

One Gateway, 420 Ft Duquesne Boulevard Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Scott Matthew Lowry

Attorney at Lowry Blixseth LLP

23632 Calabasas Road Suite 201

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Hector G Gallegos

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Ralph G Fischer

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll and Rooney PC

301 Grant Street 20Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Mehran Arjomand

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Rose S Lee

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#64

(#64) ORDER RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #63 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court GRANTS the Stipulation and reschedules the Scheduling Conference to July 30, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (lc) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

63 #1

Proposed Order

#63

(#63) Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ehret, Christian) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#62

(#62) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 week, filed by Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

#61

(#61) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION(Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

#60

(#60) ORDER RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #59 by Judge S. James Otero. The Court GRANTS the Stipulation and reschedules the Scheduling Conference to July 27, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

59 #1

Proposed Order

#59

(#59) Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallegos, Hector) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

52 #2

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-3780113), filed by SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ORDER RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #63 by Judge S. James Otero: The Court GRANTS the Stipulation and reschedules the Scheduling Conference to July 30, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (lc) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ehret, Christian) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 week, filed by Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION(Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #59 by Judge S. James Otero. The Court GRANTS the Stipulation and reschedules the Scheduling Conference to July 27, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 05/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallegos, Hector) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • (#58) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court reschedules the Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/18 to Friday, 6/29/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. During the Scheduling Conference, the Court wishes to have the parties provide a technology tutorial and overview of likely contested and potentially dispositive issues. The parties will have 20 minutes each to present their tutorials. The Court is particularly interested in hearing from Plaintiff which features of Defendant's products are alleged to practice each of the limitations of the '760 Patent. The Court is interested in hearing from Defendant regarding (1) a preview of its noninfringement arguments and (2) a high-level overview of its invalidity arguments. The Court is also interested in hearing from both parties (1) which claim term(s) are most likely to be disputed, (2) an overview of any prior litigation between the parties regarding the '760 Patent, and (3) any prior efforts to settle this dispute. The Parties are encouraged to permit less experienced lawyers (those with five or fewer years of experience) to present during the technology tutorial.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christian D. Ehret to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION and designating Scott M Lowry as local counsel #52 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cecilia R. Dickson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff SILCOTEK CORPORATION and designating Scott M Lowry as local counsel #51 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/11/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dickson, Cecilia) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SILCOTEK CORPORATION. ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC. served on 11/30/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Dickson, Cecilia) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti added. (gmp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. (gmp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Declining Assignment of Patent Case, in accordance with Section 1(a)(1)(C) of Public Law 111-349, Pilot Program in Certain District Courts. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/23/15. (njt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Christian D. Ehret on behalf of SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (Ehret, Christian) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Summons Issued as to *ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC.* (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ENTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-3780113), filed by SILCOTEK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (ept) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 4/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian D. Ehret

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott M. Lowry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cecilia R. Dickson