This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2018 at 07:37:21 (UTC).

Sierra-Lopez, David v. Walker, Scott et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Sierra-Lopez, David filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Walker, Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen L. Crocker and Barbara B. Crabb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

Presiding Judge

Barbara B. Crabb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David E. Sierra-Lopez

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

John Doe (1)

John Doe (6)

Lucas Weber

Wis. Governor Scott Walker

John Doe (5)

John Doe (3)

Bander

Chatman

John Doe (4)

Arisman

Michael Dittmann

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David E. Sierra-Lopez. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Health Service Request, #2 Exhibit B - Adult Conduct Report #2913866, #3 Summons) (Per note from CCI e-filing staff, Exhibits A and B scanned on darkest setting.) (nln) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Letter from clerk's office to plaintiff re: illegible copy of Exhibits A and B to the #1 Complaint. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

1 #3

Summons

#8

(#8) Adult Conduct Report from 7/27/2018 incident and Health Services Request dated 7/14/2018 by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Health Service Request dated 7/14/2018, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Adult Conduct Report #2913866

#7

(#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

8 #2

Envelope

8 #1

Health Service Request dated 7/14/2018

1 #1

Exhibit A - Health Service Request

#2

(#2) Declaration of David E. Sierra-Lopez re #1 Complaint. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez assessed an initial partial filing fee of $3.95 due 9/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/10/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Adult Conduct Report from 7/27/2018 incident and Health Services Request dated 7/14/2018 by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Health Service Request dated 7/14/2018, #2 Envelope) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Warden PLRA Letter. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Motion for In Forma Pauperis Screening. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Partial Filing fee received : $ 3.95, receipt number 34690032670 (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez assessed an initial partial filing fee of $3.95 due 9/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/10/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from clerk's office to plaintiff re: illegible copy of Exhibits A and B to the #1 Complaint. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statements by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln). (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration of David E. Sierra-Lopez re #1 Complaint. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David E. Sierra-Lopez. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Health Service Request, #2 Exhibit B - Adult Conduct Report #2913866, #3 Summons) (Per note from CCI e-filing staff, Exhibits A and B scanned on darkest setting.) (nln) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.