This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:25:32 (UTC).

Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. v. Pixels.com, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Sid Avery and Associates, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Pixels com, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-10232

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.

Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. doing business as MPTV Images

Defendant

Pixels.com, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonah Adam Grossbardt

Attorney at SRIPLAW PA

1801 Century Park East Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Jay A Woollacott

Attorney at Woollacott LLP

10850 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 825

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pixels.com, LLC answer now due 3/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Pixels.com, LLC.(Attorney Jay A Woollacott added to party Pixels.com, LLC(pty:dft))(Woollacott, Jay) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#11

(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than, February 7, 2019 at noon, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Defendant(s) Answer or Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to defendant(s). The Court may dismiss the entire action prior to the expiration of such time, however, if plaintiff has not diligently prosecuted the action. (iv) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc., upon Defendant Pixels.com, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Courtney H. "Doe", as person in charge of office at time of service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Pixels.com, LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Demand letters

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Infringement

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Registration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22866409 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3- Demand letters) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pixels.com, LLC answer now due 3/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Pixels.com, LLC.(Attorney Jay A Woollacott added to party Pixels.com, LLC(pty:dft))(Woollacott, Jay) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than, February 7, 2019 at noon, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Defendant(s) Answer or Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to defendant(s). The Court may dismiss the entire action prior to the expiration of such time, however, if plaintiff has not diligently prosecuted the action. (iv) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc., upon Defendant Pixels.com, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Courtney H. "Doe", as person in charge of office at time of service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Pixels.com, LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22866409 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3- Demand letters) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Sid Avery and Associates, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less