This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 07:54:20 (UTC).

SIB Properties, LLC v. Sampson et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 SIB Properties, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Sampson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00466

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIB Properties, LLC

Defendants

Alan Sampson

Jaevon Sampson

Jada Sampson

Serena Sampson Rancy

Karen Sampson

Mark Sampson

Grace Sampson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tiffinay A. Antoch

Attorney at Heitke Cook Antoch LLC

365 Eddy Street

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Shannah M. Kurland

149 Lenox Avenue

Providence, RI 02907

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#8

(#8) RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and in the Alternative Motion to Stay Decision filed by Serena Sampson Rancy, Alan Sampson. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SIB Properties, LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Antoch, Tiffinay) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Karen Sampson.(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Serena Sampson Rancy, Alan Sampson.(McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 9/4/2018 (McGuire, Vickie). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

4 #1

Clerk's Certificate

#4

(#4) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alan Sampson. (Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Appendix State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Appendix Complaint filed in State Court

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County District Court, Case Number 3CA-2018-05876. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by Alan Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Appendix State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Plaintiff's state court complaint is a state trespass and ejectment action. The complaint does not present a federal question. Although the Defendants argue they intend to assert certain federal rights because of their status as Indians that may entitle them to a greater level of protection, assertion of a federal question in a defense or counterclaim does not bestow federal question jurisdiction on the federal court in a case brought in state court. Caterpillar Inc. v. Williams, 482 U.S. 386, 392 (1987) ("federal jurisdiction exists only when a federal question is presented on the face of the plaintiff's properly pleaded complaint") - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/10/18 Certified copy of order sent to the Clerk of Court for the state court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and in the Alternative Motion to Stay Decision filed by Serena Sampson Rancy, Alan Sampson. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SIB Properties, LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Antoch, Tiffinay) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Karen Sampson.(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Serena Sampson Rancy, Alan Sampson.(McGuire, Vickie) Modified on 9/4/2018 (McGuire, Vickie). (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate)(McGuire, Vickie) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/24/2018 (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERKS NOTE: Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. Filer is directed to submit a redacted version. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alan Sampson. (Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County District Court, Case Number 3CA-2018-05876. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by Alan Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Appendix State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County District Court, Case Number 3CA-2018-05876. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by Alan Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Appendix State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurland, Shannah) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less