This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2020 at 16:05:02 (UTC).

Shults et al v. Sheldon

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 Shults filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sheldon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harold A. Baker, Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-02214

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

Presiding Judges

Harold A. Baker

Colin Stirling Bruce

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Illinois State Rifle Association

Kenneth V Shults

Second Amendment Foundation Inc

Colleen M Shults

Defendants

George H Sheldon

Beverly J Walker

Lisa Madigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David G Sigale

Attorney at LAW FIRM OF DAVID G. SIGALE, P.C.

799 Roosevelt Road, Suite 207

Glen Ellyn, IL 60137

Defendant Attorneys

Barbara Lynn Greenspan

Attorney at ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

12Th Floor, 100 W Randolph St

Chicago, IL 60601

Michaelina Gianaris Camp

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ILLINOIS ATTORNEY GENERAL

Suite 200, 100 W Randolph

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#41

#40

#39

38 #2

Exhibit Notice of Compliance with Type Volume Limitation

38 #1

Exhibit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint

#38

37 #5

Exhibit E - Depo. Trans. Excerpt of Dyer-Webster

37 #4

Exhibit D - Amended Answers to Interrogatories (SAF)

37 #3

Exhibit C - Amended Answers to Interrogatories (ISRA)

37 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Jed and Melissa Davis

37 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Darin and Jennifer Miller

#37

#36

#35

#34

33 #1

Exhibit A - Foster Family Firearms Agreement

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) JUDGMENT entered. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/1/2019. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #34 is GRANTED with prejudice. This case is terminated. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/22/2019. At the request of the parties, the Status Conference set for April 9, 2019, at 1:45 P.M. is RESCHEDULED to April 10, 2019, at 3:00 P.M.(JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/20/2019. At the request of the Court, the Status Conference set for tomorrow, March 21, 2019, is RESCHEDULED to April 9, 2019, at 1:45 P.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for the Plaintiff by David Sigale. Appearance for the Defendants by Danielle Steimel, Sarah Hunger, Barbara Greenspan and Michaelina Camp. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of the case and discovery discussed. Option for consent offered. Further Status Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 10:15 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (Tape #UR-B 10:02AM.) (JMB, ilcd) Modified on 2/22/2019 to correct typographical error (SKR, ilcd). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/14/2019. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for February 20, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. is RESCHEDULED IN TIME ONLY to February 20, 2019, at 10:00 A.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference is set for August 5, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A in Urbana. Trial is set for September 3, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A in Urbana. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/8/2019. At the request of the Court, this case is set for a Status Conference on February 20, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. by telephone from Urbana (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) REPLY In Support of Motion re #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Lisa Madigan, Beverly J Walker. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/21/2018. Defendants' Motion for leave to File Reply #38 is GRANTED. The court directs the clerk to file Defendants' Exhibit [38-1] instanter. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2016
  • TEXT ORDER: This case referred to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/7/2016. (MC, ilcd) (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to U.S. District Judge Colin S. Bruce for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 9/7/16. (DK, ilcd) (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/25/2016. The defendant has filed a motion for extension of time to answer the complaint. The motion #6 is granted. The defendant shall answer the complaint on or before September 26, 2016. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Agreed by Defendant George H Sheldon. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Greenspan, Barbara) (Entered: 08/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Barbara Lynn Greenspan on behalf of George H Sheldon (Greenspan, Barbara) (Entered: 08/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Set Deadlines: George H Sheldon answer due 8/25/2016. (JMB, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on George H. Sheldon on 07/22/2016, filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation Inc, Colleen M Shults, Kenneth V Shults. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to George H. Sheldon. (SW, ilcd) (Entered: 07/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE (Civil Cover Sheet) re #1 Complaint, (Sigale, David) (Entered: 07/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2358286.), filed by Kenneth V. Shults, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Colleen M. Shults. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Foster Family Firearms Agreement)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 07/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Rifle Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michaelina Gianaris Camp