This case was last updated from PACER on 02/23/2018 at 05:57:15 (UTC).

Shreffler v. Riverside Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 Shreffler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Riverside Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02068

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Shreffler

Gilman, IL 60938

Defendants

Catherine Mau

Kankakee Co. Sheriff's Department

Jodi Norton

A to Z towing

Iroquois County Sheriff

Beaupre Towing

Ralph Norton

Riverside Medical Center

Illinois State Police

Jan Coy

Bourbonnais Police Department

Mccolly Real Estate

Larry Menz Towing

Harry Gherig

Mainstreet Mechanical Services LLC

Presence St. Mary's Hospital

Larry Reigner

Bradley Police Department

Darin Westphal

4 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08961. . (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#8

(#8) TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division the electronic record. (ks, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division for consideration of Plaintiff's amended in forma pauperis application #6 and complaint #1 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). No further filings in this case are appropriate in the Northern District of Illinois under Case No. 17 C 8961. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/22/2018. Mailed notice(ks, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Scott Shreffler for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (Envelope postmarked 2/13/2018) (Received for docketing 2/21/2018). (mc, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/22/2018 to remove prisoner trust fund ledgers; see #10 ) (KM, ilcd). (Entered: 02/21/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER: By order dated December 18, 2017 #3 , the Court directed Plaintiff to file a properly supported application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. In response, Plaintiff filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 that is certified but does not attach a copy of his trust fund account statement from the Cook County Jail. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Accordingly, his application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit a signed and accurately completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that is accompanied by (1) a copy of his trust fund statement from the date of his detention (October 3, 2017) to the present that is (2) certified by a trust fund officer at the Jail. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order by February 9, 2018 will result in summary dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/12/2018. Mailed notice (eaa, ) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Scott Shreffler for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Envelope postmarked 01/03/18). (eaa, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a complaint #1 but did not prepay the filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. By January 31, 2018, Plaintiff must either: (1) submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes the documentation and certification described below; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. If he does not comply, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/18/2017. Mailed notice (eaa, ) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

1 #1

Envelope postmark 12/05/2017

#1

(#1) Complaint received and no copies by Scott Shreffler; Jury Demand. (jk, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2017: #1 Envelope postmark 12/05/2017) (jk, ). Modified on 2/22/2018 to correct to Complaint event (KM, ilcd). (Entered: 12/14/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Scott Shreffler. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-08961. . (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division the electronic record. (ks, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division for consideration of Plaintiff's amended in forma pauperis application #6 and complaint #1 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). No further filings in this case are appropriate in the Northern District of Illinois under Case No. 17 C 8961. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/22/2018. Mailed notice(ks, ) (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Scott Shreffler for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (Envelope postmarked 2/13/2018) (Received for docketing 2/21/2018). (mc, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/22/2018 to remove prisoner trust fund ledgers; see #10 ) (KM, ilcd). (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of the order dated 1/12/2018 to Plaintiff Scott Shreffler. (eaa, ) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: By order dated December 18, 2017 #3 , the Court directed Plaintiff to file a properly supported application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. In response, Plaintiff filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 that is certified but does not attach a copy of his trust fund account statement from the Cook County Jail. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). Accordingly, his application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit a signed and accurately completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that is accompanied by (1) a copy of his trust fund statement from the date of his detention (October 3, 2017) to the present that is (2) certified by a trust fund officer at the Jail. Alternatively, Plaintiff may pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order by February 9, 2018 will result in summary dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/12/2018. Mailed notice (eaa, ) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Scott Shreffler for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Envelope postmarked 01/03/18). (eaa, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of the order dated 12/18/2017 to Plaintiff Scott Shreffler. (eaa, ) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a complaint #1 but did not prepay the filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. By January 31, 2018, Plaintiff must either: (1) submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes the documentation and certification described below; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. If he does not comply, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/18/2017. Mailed notice (eaa, ) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jk, ) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint received and no copies by Scott Shreffler; Jury Demand. (jk, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2017: #1 Envelope postmark 12/05/2017) (jk, ). Modified on 2/22/2018 to correct to Complaint event (KM, ilcd). (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less