This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2018 at 07:26:57 (UTC).

Sherwin-Williams Company, The v. Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 Sherwin-Williams Company, The filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donovan W. Frank and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-02964

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherwin-Williams Company, The

Defendant

Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher L Lynch

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

225 S. 6Th Street, Suite 2800

Mpls, MN 55402

Andy Detherage

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

11 S. Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John P Fischer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

11 S. Meridian St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Patricia E Volpe

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Joel T Wiegert

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, PLLP

33 S 6Th St Ste 4400

Mpls, MN 55402

Charles A Brinkley

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger - Dallas

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

Michael Keeley

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger - Dallas

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia E Volpe on behalf of Sherwin-Williams Company, The. (Volpe, Patricia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew J. Detherage. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6463315 filed by Sherwin-Williams Company, The. (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John P Fischer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6463274 filed by Sherwin-Williams Company, The. (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C. Adam Brinkley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6445232 filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Keeley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6445223 filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Beazley is 100% owned by Beazley, PLC. Beazley, PLC is a publicly held corporation traded on the London Stock Exchange for Defendant Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.(Wiegert, Joel) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (MMG). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-CV-18-16565 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6445164) filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John P Fischer for The Sherwin-Williams Company.; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andy Detherage for The Sherwin-Williams Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/31/2018. (JGK) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia E Volpe on behalf of Sherwin-Williams Company, The. (Volpe, Patricia) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew J. Detherage. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6463315 filed by Sherwin-Williams Company, The. (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John P Fischer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6463274 filed by Sherwin-Williams Company, The. (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles A Brinkley for Beazley Insurance Company, Inc..; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Keeley for Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/26/2018. (JGK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Andrew J. Detherage and John P. Fischer as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-2964 (DWF/DTS). (MMP) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney C. Adam Brinkley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6445232 filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Keeley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6445223 filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Beazley is 100% owned by Beazley, PLC. Beazley, PLC is a publicly held corporation traded on the London Stock Exchange for Defendant Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.(Wiegert, Joel) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (MMG). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-CV-18-16565 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6445164) filed by Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.