This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2018 at 00:42:38 (UTC).

Sheppard v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 Sheppard filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel E. Knowles and Sarah S. Vance. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-02401

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Knowles

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Frank Sheppard

Defendants

Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

General Electric Company

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

OneBeacon America Insurance Company

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Montello, Inc.

Pennsylvania General Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Uniroyal Holding, Inc.

Union Carbide Coporation

McCarty Corporation

Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.

Riley Power, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Peter Dinehart(Designation Retained)

Defendant Attorneys

Sherman Gene Fendler(Designation Retained)

Angela M. Bowlin(Designation Retained)

Peter R. Tafaro(Designation Retained)

Kelsey A. Eagan(Designation Retained)

Susan Beth Kohn(Designation Retained)

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III(Designation Retained)

Deborah DeRoche Kuchler(Designation Retained)

Melissa M. Desormeaux(Designation Retained)

Michael H. Abraham(Designation Retained)

Perrey S. Lee(Designation Retained)

Francis Xavier deBlanc, III(Designation Retained)

Lori Allen Waters(Designation Retained)

Joseph Henry Hart, IV(Designation Retained)

Douglas Kinler(Designation Retained)

April Ann McQuillar(Designation Retained)

Jennifer H. McLaughlin(Designation Retained)

Jamie M Zanovec(Designation Retained)

Jennifer E. Adams(Designation Retained)

William Claudy Harrison, Jr.(Designation Retained)

41 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#418

(#418) ORDER AND REASONS - defendants' motion 210 to exclude expert opinion testimony of plaintiff Jesse Frank Sheppard's treating physicians on the grounds that Sheppard failed to comply with expert disclosure requirements is GRANTED. Sheppard's treating physicians may offer only lay testimony at trial.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/2/17. (jjs)

#373

(#373) ORDERED that Plaintiff's 175 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Records Deposition is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the subpoena is modified as outlined above. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 264 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Records Deposition and Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in full given that this subpoena seeks no settlement documents. FURTHER ORDER that Plaintiff's 189 Motion to Overrule Rile Power, Inc.'s Objections and Compel Meani ngful Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the Court orders Riley to respond to plaintiff's discovery requests related to any facility at which Sheppard worked and at which Riley Power may have had boilers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 1/23/2017. (cms)

#381

(#381) ORDER granting 205 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 205 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/24/2017. (mmm)

#406

(#406) ORDER AND REASONS - Liberty Mutual's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This Order applies only to claims against Liberty Mutual in its individual capacity, and has no bearing on Sheppard's claims against Liberty Mutual in its limited capacity as the alleged insurer of purported Mosaic executives.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/30/17. (jjs)

#144

(#144) ORDER & REASONS denying 61 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/17/2016. (mmm)

#108

(#108) ORDER & REASONS denying 68 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/26/2016. (mmm)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#418) ORDER AND REASONS - defendants' motion 210 to exclude expert opinion testimony of plaintiff Jesse Frank Sheppard's treating physicians on the grounds that Sheppard failed to comply with expert disclosure requirements is GRANTED. Sheppard's treating physicians may offer only lay testimony at trial.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/2/17. (jjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#406) ORDER AND REASONS - Liberty Mutual's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This Order applies only to claims against Liberty Mutual in its individual capacity, and has no bearing on Sheppard's claims against Liberty Mutual in its limited capacity as the alleged insurer of purported Mosaic executives.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/30/17. (jjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#381) ORDER granting 205 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 205 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/24/2017. (mmm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#373) ORDERED that Plaintiff's 175 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Records Deposition is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the subpoena is modified as outlined above. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 264 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Records Deposition and Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in full given that this subpoena seeks no settlement documents. FURTHER ORDER that Plaintiff's 189 Motion to Overrule Rile Power, Inc.'s Objections and Compel Meani ngful Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the Court orders Riley to respond to plaintiff's discovery requests related to any facility at which Sheppard worked and at which Riley Power may have had boilers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 1/23/2017. (cms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) ORDER & REASONS denying 61 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/17/2016. (mmm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) ORDER & REASONS denying 68 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/26/2016. (mmm)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.