This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:57:05 (UTC).

Shea v. Hester et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Shea filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hester. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Shea

Defendants

Luke Hester

Justin Wallace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edmund J Schmidt, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Edmund J. Schmidt, III

2323 21St Avenue South, Suite 502

Nashville, TN 37212

Jennifer E Olson

Attorney at Schwebel Goetz & Sieben

5120 Ids Center, 80 South Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Mikel Alan Towe

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

One Centre Square, 620 Market Street, 5Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37901

Chris W. McCarty

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

One Centre Square, 620 Market Street, 5Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) : A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. Attorney included a certificate from a state court, not adistrict court. A copy of this order has been sent via U.S. Mail to Jennifer Olson. (MDG) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Shea. Justin Wallace waiver sent on 9/13/2018. (Schmidt, Edmund) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

1 #3

Summons Justin Wallace

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3756634.), filed by Robert Shea. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Luke Hester, #3 Summons Justin Wallace)(Schmidt, Edmund) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris W. McCarty on behalf of Justin Wallace (McCarty, Chris) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Justin Wallace.(Towe, Mikel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

1 #2

Summons Luke Hester

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Luke Hester and Justin Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Summons Luke Hester) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

3 #1

Summons Luke Hester

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/29/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Olson) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Good Standing from District Court to satisfy #9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (MDG) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luke Hester. Luke Hester waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Meares, Martha) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mikel Alan Towe on behalf of Justin Wallace (Towe, Mikel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 - Rec # K3036366) by Robert Shea. (MDG) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/29/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Olson) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Justin Wallace.(Towe, Mikel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mikel Alan Towe on behalf of Justin Wallace (Towe, Mikel) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris W. McCarty on behalf of Justin Wallace (McCarty, Chris) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/15/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Robert Shea as to Robert Shea (MDG) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certificate of Good Standing from District Court to satisfy #9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (MDG) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luke Hester. Luke Hester waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Meares, Martha) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) : A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. Attorney included a certificate from a state court, not adistrict court. A copy of this order has been sent via U.S. Mail to Jennifer Olson. (MDG) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Robert Shea as to Robert Shea (MDG) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Shea. Justin Wallace waiver sent on 9/13/2018. (Schmidt, Edmund) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 - Rec # K3036366) by Robert Shea. (MDG) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/29/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Olson) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/29/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Olson) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/29/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Jennifer Olson) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Luke Hester and Justin Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Summons Luke Hester) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Jennifer Olson is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (Copy of Notice mailed to Jennifer Olson) (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3756634.), filed by Robert Shea. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Luke Hester, #3 Summons Justin Wallace)(Schmidt, Edmund) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.