This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2018 at 05:27:52 (UTC).

SHAVERS v. BLAKELY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 SHAVERS filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against BLAKELY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William S. Duffey, Jr and Linda T. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00239

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William S. Duffey, Jr

Referral Judge

Linda T. Walker

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHAWN A SHAVERS

Respondent

Don Blakely

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Trust Account Statement

3 #2

Cover Letter

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHAWN A SHAVERS. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

3 #3

Envelope

6 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 7:17-cv-00203. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case and Notice of Change of Address filed by SHAWN A SHAVERS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/17/18. (sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

4 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Langstaff issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

1 #10

Envelope

1 #9

Cover Letter

1 #8

Exh. of Order

1 #7

Exh. 8 - 11 - State case documents

1 #1

Exh. 1 - Letter from Lawrence Lewis to Petitioner

1 #2

Exh. 2 - Letter from Lawrence Lewis to Petitioner

1 #3

Exh. 3 - Letter

1 #4

Exh. 4 - 6 - Letters and Affidavit

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, submitted to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (aar) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 7:17-cv-00203. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 1/17/18. (sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Transfer Case and Notice of Change of Address filed by SHAWN A SHAVERS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHAWN A SHAVERS. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Langstaff issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by SHAWN A SHAVERS. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 - Letter from Lawrence Lewis to Petitioner, #2 Exh. 2 - Letter from Lawrence Lewis to Petitioner, #3 Exh. 3 - Letter, #4 Exh. 4 - 6 - Letters and Affidavit, #5 Exh 6B - Letter, #6 Exh. 7 - State case documents, #7 Exh. 8 - 11 - State case documents, #8 Exh. of Order, #9 Cover Letter, #10 Envelope)(sbd) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.