This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2019 at 19:51:46 (UTC).

Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. v. Applied Underwriters, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2016 Shasta Linen Supply, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Applied Underwriters, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb and Allison Claire. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William B. Shubb

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Shasta Linen Supply, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Applied Underwriters, Inc

Applied Risk Services, Inc.

Applied Underwriters, Inc.

Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.

California Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John Douglas Moore

Attorney at Law Office of John Douglas Moore

1999 Harrison St., 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Craig E. Farmer

Attorney at Farmer Smith & Lane LLP

3620 American River Dr., #218

Sacramento, CA 95864

Glen L. Abramson, PHV

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market St., Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John L. Hall

Attorney at Farmer Smith & Lane LLP

3620 American River Dr., #218

Sacramento, CA 95864

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Shand Scott Stephens

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

Spencer Y. Kook

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

633 W Fifth St., 47Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Travis R. Wall

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raoul Dion Kennedy

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP

525 University Avenue, Suite 1400

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Jeanette Barzelay

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

John Russell Stedman

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#129

(#129) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 05/15/19 MODIFYING Scheduling order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 06/10/19; Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 06/24/19; the date to serve written discovery requests to experts is 07/26/19; the time to serve written responses and documents responsive to expert discovery requests shall be within 14 days from the date of service of the requests; Close of expert discovery: 07/12/19; Dispositive motions filed by 07/12/19 with Oppositions due 08/12/19, any replies due 08/26/19 and heard on 09/09/19 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 09/30/19 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Trial REMAINS 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; the time for the parties to complete the VDRP is EXTENDED to 07/10/19 (cc: VDRP). (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#128

(#128) REVISED #127 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. (Abramson, Glen) Modified on 5/15/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#127

(#127) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. (Abramson, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#126

(#126) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/25/19 ORDERING: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/20/19. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 6/10/19. Discovery requests to experts due by 6/14/19. Written responses within 14 days. Close of expert discovery is 7/8/19. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/8/19. Opposition to dispositive motions due by 8/19/19. Replies in support of dispositive motions due by 9/9/19. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/19 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Coll, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#125

(#125) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Applied Risk Services, Inc., Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Applied Underwriters, Inc., California Insurance Company. (Barzelay, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#124

(#124) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/17/19 DENYING Alpha Polishing's Request for Leave to File a Renewed Motion for Class Certification; DENYING as MOOT plaintiffs' request to communicate with putative class members to develop additional evidence. CONSOLIDATING for the purposes of a bench trial Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. v. Applied Underwriters, Inc., Case No. 2:16-cv-00158-WBS-AC and Pet Food Express Ltd. v. Applied Underwriters, Inc., Case No. 2:16-cv-0211-WBS-AC; REFERRING these actions to the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP"). Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, the parties shall contact the court's VDRP administrator, Sujean Park, at (916) 930-4278 or SPark@caed.uscourts.gov, to start the process of selecting an appropriate neutral. The parties shall complete the VDRP session no later than 6/14/19. Any objections to this referral to the VDRP shall be filed within seven (7) days. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

122 #2

Exhibit 2

122 #1

Exhibit 1

#122

(#122) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Stephens, Shand) Modified on 4/9/2019 (York, M). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. (Farmer, Craig) Modified on 1/27/2016 (Michel, G.). (Entered: 01/27/2016)

3 #2

VDRP

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 5/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Applied Risk Services, Inc., Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Applied Underwriters, Inc., California Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig E. Farmer* *Farmer Smith & Lane Llp* *3620 American River Drive, #218* *Sacramento, CA 95864*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Unfair Business Practices and Fraud against All Defendants by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc.. Attorney Farmer, Craig E. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6283303) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farmer, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

245 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 05/15/19 MODIFYING Scheduling order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 06/10/19; Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 06/24/19; the date to serve written discovery requests to experts is 07/26/19; the time to serve written responses and documents responsive to expert discovery requests shall be within 14 days from the date of service of the requests; Close of expert discovery: 07/12/19; Dispositive motions filed by 07/12/19 with Oppositions due 08/12/19, any replies due 08/26/19 and heard on 09/09/19 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 09/30/19 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Trial REMAINS 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; the time for the parties to complete the VDRP is EXTENDED to 07/10/19 (cc: VDRP). (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) REVISED #127 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. (Abramson, Glen) Modified on 5/15/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. (Abramson, Glen) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/25/19 ORDERING: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/20/19. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 6/10/19. Discovery requests to experts due by 6/14/19. Written responses within 14 days. Close of expert discovery is 7/8/19. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/8/19. Opposition to dispositive motions due by 8/19/19. Replies in support of dispositive motions due by 9/9/19. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/19 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Coll, A) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Applied Risk Services, Inc., Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Applied Underwriters, Inc., California Insurance Company. (Barzelay, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/17/19 DENYING Alpha Polishing's Request for Leave to File a Renewed Motion for Class Certification; DENYING as MOOT plaintiffs' request to communicate with putative class members to develop additional evidence. CONSOLIDATING for the purposes of a bench trial Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. v. Applied Underwriters, Inc., Case No. 2:16-cv-00158-WBS-AC and Pet Food Express Ltd. v. Applied Underwriters, Inc., Case No. 2:16-cv-0211-WBS-AC; REFERRING these actions to the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP"). Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, the parties shall contact the court's VDRP administrator, Sujean Park, at (916) 930-4278 or SPark@caed.uscourts.gov, to start the process of selecting an appropriate neutral. The parties shall complete the VDRP session no later than 6/14/19. Any objections to this referral to the VDRP shall be filed within seven (7) days. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#123) MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: STATUS CONFERENCE re Class Status held on 4/15/2019. Court confers with counsel re trial status and status of the class. All parties agree that the matter will be tried as a bench trial. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiff's Counsel Peter Kahana, Craig Farmer present. Defendants' Counsel Shand Stephens, Jeanette Barzelay, Travis Wall, Spencer Kook present. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Stephens, Shand) Modified on 4/9/2019 (York, M). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/27/2019 ORDERING the following deadlines EXTENDED: The time to make expert disclosures and exchange expert reports is EXTENDED to 4/29/2019; The time to make rebuttal expert disclosures and exchange rebuttal expert reports is EXTENDED to 5/20/2019; The time to serve written discovery requests to experts is EXTENDED to 6/10/2019; The date for the close of expert discovery is EXTENDED to 7/15/2019. (Washington, S) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order by Applied Risk Services, Inc., Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Applied Underwriters, Inc., California Insurance Company. (Barzelay, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. served on 4/12/2016. (Farmer, Craig) Modified on 4/25/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Applied Underwriters, Inc. served on 4/12/2016. (Farmer, Craig) Modified on 4/25/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Applied Risk Services, Inc. served on 4/12/2016. (Farmer, Craig) Modified on 4/25/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER continuing Status Conference and corresponding deadlines by Applied Underwriters, Inc. (Stedman, John) Modified on 4/25/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION Extending Defendants deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Applied Underwriters, Inc. Attorney Stedman, John Russell added. (Stedman, John) Modified on 4/25/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 04/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Farmer, Craig) (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc. (Farmer, Craig) Modified on 1/27/2016 (Michel, G.). (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 5/9/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Applied Risk Services, Inc., Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc., Applied Underwriters, Inc., California Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig E. Farmer* *Farmer Smith & Lane Llp* *3620 American River Drive, #218* *Sacramento, CA 95864*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Unfair Business Practices and Fraud against All Defendants by Shasta Linen Supply, Inc.. Attorney Farmer, Craig E. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6283303) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farmer, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less