This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:37:28 (UTC).

Sharpless v. Ark Hope Management

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Sharpless filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ark Hope Management. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Rutherford and David C Godbey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02240

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rebecca Rutherford

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Clay Sharpless

Dallas, TX 75216

Defendant

Ark Hope Management

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint or Assign Some Tax Payer to Take Over Matter filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. (zkc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Ark Hope Management filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint or Assign a Tax Payer Law Firm to Matter filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. (axm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#5

(#5) OBJECTION filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless re: #4 Notice of Application of a Prior Sanction Order To Close New Case. (zkc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 3:18-cv-2240-N-BT. The sanction order was originally filed in: 3:13-cv-2786-P-BK and states: It is further ordered that Plaintiff is BARRED from filing in this Court unless he first pays the entire filing fee, demonstrates that he has satisfied all outstanding monetary sanctions against him, and obtains judicial permission before filing. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (ctf) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appoint or Assign a Tax Payer Law Firm to Matter filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. (axm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint or Assign Some Tax Payer to Take Over Matter filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. (zkc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OBJECTION filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless re: #4 Notice of Application of a Prior Sanction Order To Close New Case. (zkc) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Aug 28 12:25:28 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 3:18-cv-2240-N-BT. The sanction order was originally filed in: 3:13-cv-2786-P-BK and states: It is further ordered that Plaintiff is BARRED from filing in this Court unless he first pays the entire filing fee, demonstrates that he has satisfied all outstanding monetary sanctions against him, and obtains judicial permission before filing. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (ctf) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Ark Hope Management filed by Dennis Clay Sharpless. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.