This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2018 at 07:00:52 (UTC).

Sharp v. Intracoastal Capital LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 Sharp filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Intracoastal Capital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-05579

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradley D. Sharp

Defendants

Anson Investments Master Fund LP

Intracoastal Capital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H. Troy Romero

Attorney at Romero Park P.S

16935 West Bernardo Dr. #260

San Diego, CA 92127

Henry I. Bornstein

Attorney at Bantko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

1 Embarcadero Center #800

San Francisco, CA 94111

H Troy Romero

Attorney at Romero Park & Wiggins PS

17140 Bernardo Center Dr #206

San Diego, CA 92128

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Bach-y-Rita

Attorney at Chapman and Cutler LLP

595 Market Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Leo V. Gagion

Attorney at Chapman and Cutler LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10020-1708

David T.B. Audley

Attorney at Chapman and Cutler LLP

111 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603-4080

Michael Friedman

Attorney at Chapman and Cutler LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10020-1708

Scott Mendeloff

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

77 West Wacker Drive #3100

Chicago, IL 60601

David S. Repking

Attorney at Greenber Traurig LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive #3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Gabriel Aizenberg

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive #3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael R. Hogue

Attorney at Greenber Traurig LLP

4 Embarcadero Center #3000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Katharine Malone

Attorney at Greenberg Traugig LLP

4 Embarcadero Center #3000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Court Docket

1 #3

Certificate of Service

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Request by Appellant Pursuant to Request by Bankruptcy Court by Bradley D. Sharp (Romero, H) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF BRIEFING; (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-03063. File received. Filed byBradley D. Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Court Docket, #3 Certificate of Service)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANSON INVESTMENTS MASTER FUND L.P. A CAYMAN ISLANDS PARTNERSHIP is a litigant